EP0631433 - Video camera and method of controlling the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.07.2000 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/52] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamada, Kunihiko, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [1994/52] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/52] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court High Holborn London WC1R 5DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 94304466.9 | 20.06.1994 | [1994/52] | Priority number, date | JP19930149462 | 21.06.1993 Original published format: JP 14946293 | [1994/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0631433 | Date: | 28.12.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0631433 | Date: | 22.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/232 | [1994/52] | CPC: |
H04N23/60 (EP,US);
H04N7/22 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1994/52] | Title | German: | Videokamera und Verfahren zum Steuern der Videokamera | [1994/52] | English: | Video camera and method of controlling the same | [1994/52] | French: | Caméra vidéo et méthode pour la commande de la caméra | [1994/52] | Examination procedure | 17.05.1995 | Examination requested [1995/31] | 06.08.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.08.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.02.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.12.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.08.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.12.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.03.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 05.03.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.06.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 22.09.1999 | [2008/05] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0424111 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1,2,14,18,20,23* abstract *; | [A]US5093716 (KONDO TOSHIHARU [JP], et al) [A] 1,2,14,18,20,23 * figures 1,4A,4B; claims 1-3 *; | [A]US5101277 (KANATA YOSHIO [JP]) [A] 1,2,14,18,20,23 * column W *; | [A]EP0501723 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1,2,14,18,20,23 * the whole document *; | [A] - NAUFEL, "Serial techniques expand your options for uC peripherals", EDN ELECTRICAL DESIGN NEWS, NEWTON, MASSACHUSETTS US, (19880218), vol. 33, no. 4, pages 199 - 204, XP000567957 [A] * the whole document * |