EP0688859 - A process for treating textiles and compositions therefore [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.12.1996 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.12.1996 | Withdrawal of application | published on 29.01.1997 [1997/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/52] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Boutique, Jean-Pol 32, Rue Emile Labarre B-5030 Gembloux / BE | 02 /
Glogowski, Mark William 3160 Lancer Lane Cincinnati, Ohio 45239 / US | 03 /
Hardy, Frederick Edward 8 Woodend, Darras Hall Ponteland, Newcastle upon Tyne, NE20 9ES / GB | 04 /
Johnston, James Pyott Weidelaan 17 B-3090 Overijse / BE | 05 /
Labeque, Regine Rue de Lombardzyde, 27 B-1120 Brussels / BE | 06 /
Murch, Bruce Prentiss 7846 Glenbrook Court Cincinnati, Ohio 45224 / US | 07 /
Panandiker, Rajan 6484 Oregon Pass West Chester, Ohio 45069 / US | [1995/52] | Representative(s) | Gibson, Tony Nicholas, et al Procter & Gamble (NTC) Limited Whitley Road Longbenton Newcastle upon Tyne NE12 9TS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/52] | Gibson, Tony Nicholas, et al Procter & Gamble (NTC) Limited Whitley Road Longbenton Newcastle upon Tyne NE12 9TS / GB | Application number, filing date | 94304532.8 | 22.06.1994 | [1995/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0688859 | Date: | 27.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C11D17/00, C11D1/12 | [1995/52] | CPC: |
C11D17/0004 (EP);
C11D1/02 (EP);
C11D1/29 (EP);
C11D3/0021 (EP);
C11D3/3932 (EP);
C11D3/3947 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1995/52] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Behandlung von Textilien und dessen Zusammensetzungen | [1995/52] | English: | A process for treating textiles and compositions therefore | [1995/52] | French: | Procédé de traitement de textiles et compositions utilisées à cet effet | [1995/52] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 14.06.1996 | Examination requested [1996/33] | 09.12.1996 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1997/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0587550 (PROCTER & GAMBLE CO.) [A] 1,2,7-10 * page 6, line 46 - line 48 * * page 10, line 24 - line 54 * * claim - *; | [A]FR2359893 (PROCTER & GAMBLE CO.) [A] 1 * example -; claim - *; | [A]WO9209677 (S.B.CHEMICALS LIMITED) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP0317066 (THE CLOROX COMPANY) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [DA]DD120051 (GRUNWALD SONJA ET AL.) [DA] 1 * claim - * |