EP0630651 - Semi-solid pharmaceutical agent and process to produce the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.01.2002 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA HAYASHIBARA SEIBUTSU KAGAKU KENKYUJO 2-3, 1-chome, Shimoishii Okayama-shi, Okayama / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/52] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA HAYASHIBARA SEIBUTSU KAGAKU KENKYUJO 2-3, 1-chome, Shimoishii Okayama-shi Okayama / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ikeda, Masao 5-13, Hon-cho Kurashiki-Shi, Okayama / JP | 02 /
Tatefuji, Tomoki 525-3-210, Kuwano Okayama-shi, Okayama / JP | 03 /
Yamauchi, Hiroshi 16-12, 4-chome, Chitsukoo Tamano-shi, Okayama / JP | [1994/52] | Representative(s) | Daniels, Jeffrey Nicholas, et al Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/52] | Daniels, Jeffrey Nicholas, et al Page White & Farrer 54 Doughty Street London WC1N 2LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 94304657.3 | 27.06.1994 | [1994/52] | Priority number, date | JP19930178614 | 28.06.1993 Original published format: JP 17861493 | [1994/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0630651 | Date: | 28.12.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0630651 | Date: | 06.11.1996 | [1996/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0630651 | Date: | 14.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.09.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/26, A61K47/44 | [1994/52] | CPC: |
A61K9/02 (EP,KR,US);
A61K9/06 (EP,KR,US);
A61K47/26 (EP,KR,US);
A61K9/0014 (EP,KR,US);
Y10S424/15 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1994/52] | Title | German: | Halbfeste Arzneimittel sowie Verfahren zu deren Herstellung | [1994/52] | English: | Semi-solid pharmaceutical agent and process to produce the same | [1994/52] | French: | Produit pharmaceutique semi-solide et son procédé de préparation | [1994/52] | Examination procedure | 24.01.1997 | Examination requested [1997/13] | 04.11.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.03.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 08.06.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.09.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.11.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 21.11.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.12.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 14.03.2001 | AT | 27.06.2001 | PT | 27.06.2001 | BE | 30.06.2001 | CH | 30.06.2001 | LI | 30.06.2001 | DK | 31.07.2001 | ES | 27.09.2001 | [2008/29] |
Former [2004/04] | SE | 14.03.2001 | |
AT | 27.06.2001 | ||
BE | 30.06.2001 | ||
CH | 30.06.2001 | ||
LI | 30.06.2001 | ||
DK | 31.07.2001 | ||
ES | 27.09.2001 | ||
Former [2003/50] | SE | 14.03.2001 | |
AT | 27.06.2001 | ||
BE | 30.06.2001 | ||
CH | 30.06.2001 | ||
LI | 30.06.2001 | ||
DK | 31.07.2001 | ||
Former [2003/31] | SE | 14.03.2001 | |
AT | 27.06.2001 | ||
BE | 30.06.2001 | ||
CH | 30.06.2001 | ||
LI | 30.06.2001 | ||
Former [2003/10] | AT | 27.06.2001 | |
BE | 30.06.2001 | ||
CH | 30.06.2001 | ||
LI | 30.06.2001 | ||
Former [2003/01] | BE | 30.06.2001 | |
CH | 30.06.2001 | ||
LI | 30.06.2001 | ||
Former [2002/29] | BE | 30.06.2001 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0080879 (SUNSTAR KK [JP], et al) [X] 1,3,4,7 * page 12; example 1 *; | [X]GB2183808 (HAYASHIBARA BIOCHEM LAB) [X] 1-7 * page 1, line 33 - line 46 * * page 5, line 62 - page 6, line 7 * * page 4, line 2 - line 15 * * page 19; example 16 *; | [X]FR2620331 (SANDOZ SA [CH]) [X] 1-8,11 * page 3, paragraph 6 * * page 4, paragraph 1 - paragraph 2 * * page 7, paragraph 7 * * page 8 - page 9; example 1 *; | [X]WO9113601 (RORER INT OVERSEAS [US]) [X] 1-7* page 25; example 10 *; | [X]EP0504483 (PULITZER ITALIANA [IT]) [X] 1-7 * page 3; example 1 *; | [X]EP0533938 (TSUMURA & CO [JP]) [X] 1-7 * page 4; example 1 * |