EP0633178 - Brake for pushchair or perambulator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.02.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.03.1996 [1996/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BRITAX-TEUTONIA KINDERWAGENFABRIK GmbH Postfach 1454 D-32112 Hiddenhausen / DE | [1995/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Anhofer, Frank Belzweg 218 D-33739 Bielefeld / DE | [1995/02] | Representative(s) | Hollinghurst, Antony Britax Childcare Limited 1 Churchill Way West Andover Hampshire SP10 3UW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/02] | Hollinghurst, Antony B.S.G. International plc Patent Department Castle Trading Estate East Street Portchester, Hants PO16 9SD / GB | Application number, filing date | 94304846.2 | 01.07.1994 | [1995/02] | Priority number, date | GB19930014316 | 10.07.1993 Original published format: GB 9314316 | [1995/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0633178 | Date: | 11.01.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.10.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B62B9/08 | [1995/02] | CPC: |
B62B9/082 (EP);
B62B9/087 (EP);
B62B5/0433 (EP);
B62B5/0461 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, PT, SE [1995/02] | Title | German: | Bremse für Kinderwagen | [1995/02] | English: | Brake for pushchair or perambulator | [1995/02] | French: | Frein pour poussette ou voiture d'enfant | [1995/02] | File destroyed: | 13.09.2003 | Examination procedure | 12.07.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/13] | 31.10.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1996/13] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE205946 (PAUL LIEDTKE); | [A]GB161288 (STURGIS STEEL GO CART COMPANY); | [A]CH243758 (BENZ ERNST F [CH]); | [XA]GB1604461 (GPG INT LTD) [X] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2,3 |