EP0637431 - Suture device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.03.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.04.1996 [1996/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VODA, Jan 1404 Camden Way Oklahoma City, OK 73116 / US | [1995/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1995/06] | Representative(s) | Allen, William Guy Fairfax J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/06] | Allen, William Guy Fairfax J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 94305067.4 | 11.07.1994 | [1995/06] | Priority number, date | US19930102575 | 05.08.1993 Original published format: US 102575 | [1995/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0637431 | Date: | 08.02.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.12.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/04 | [1995/06] | CPC: |
A61B17/0057 (EP,US);
A61B17/0469 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00637 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00663 (EP,US);
A61B2017/047 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0472 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1995/06] | Title | German: | Nähvorrichtung | [1995/06] | English: | Suture device | [1995/06] | French: | Dispositif à suturer | [1995/06] | File destroyed: | 13.09.2003 | Examination procedure | 09.08.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/17] | 28.11.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1996/17] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5021059 (KENSEY KENNETH [US], et al); | [A]US4744364 (KENSEY KENNETH [US]) |