EP0657382 - Fluid delivery system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.04.1999 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.04.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.06.1999 [1999/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ciba Corning Diagnostics Corp. 63 North Street Medfield, MA 02052-1688 / US | [1995/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Venooker, Ronald J. 4 Mill River Circle Franklin, MA 02038 / US | 02 /
Scavitto, John A. 57 Neck Hill Road, P.O. Box 180 Mendon, MA 01756 / US | 03 /
Karkantis, Peter N. 5 Gioconda Avenue Acton, MA 01720 / US | 04 /
Healey, David T. 348 Park Street, Suite 107E No. Reading, MA 01864 / US | 05 /
Travers, Richard L. 57 Old Oaken Bucket Road Scituate, MA 02066 / US | [1995/24] | Representative(s) | Froud, Clive, et al Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/16] | Froud, Clive, et al Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | ||
Former [1995/24] | Boon, Graham Anthony Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 94305376.9 | 21.07.1994 | [1995/24] | Priority number, date | US19930165137 | 09.12.1993 Original published format: US 165137 | [1995/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0657382 | Date: | 14.06.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0657382 | Date: | 19.07.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0657382 | Date: | 17.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.05.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B67D5/02 | [1995/24] | CPC: |
B67D7/0277 (EP,US);
B67D7/06 (KR);
B01L3/565 (EP,US);
B67D7/0294 (EP,US);
G01N35/1002 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [1995/24] | Title | German: | Flüssigkeitsabgabesystem | [1995/24] | English: | Fluid delivery system | [1995/24] | French: | Système d'administration de fluide | [1995/24] | Examination procedure | 17.07.1995 | Examination requested [1995/37] | 19.02.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.07.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.03.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.11.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.12.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 17.12.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP97203232.0 / EP0829451 | EP97203233.8 / EP0825148 | Opposition(s) | 18.03.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]AU1414976D (MOBIL AUSTRALIA LTD.) [X] 17,18 * figures 3-5 *; | [A]US2526630 (BOURKE THOMAS N) [A] 1,4 * figures 3,5 *; | [A]FR2364827 (GRUNDY TEDDINGTON LTD [GB]) [A] 1,4 * figures 1,2 *; | [X]US4089444 (SHEA RONALD E) [X] 1 * figure 1 *; | [A]EP0029774 (GLEIZES RAYMOND) [A] 17 * abstract *; | [A]EP0298376 (BADERI JOPADO [US]) [A] 1 * figures 2,10-13 *; | [A]EP0345071 (JAYPAK LTD [GB]) [A] 17* figures 1-5 *; | [X]EP0477477 (WILBUR ELLIS COMPANY [US]) [X] 1-3 * column 4, line 25 - line 32 * * column 11, line 39 - column 13, line 33; figures 3,4 *; | [X]EP0548570 (BURGERT BURDOSA [DE]) [X] 1-3,17 * abstract * |