EP0638840 - Silver halide photographic lightsensitive material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 28.01.2000 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.01.2000 | Refusal of application | published on 15.03.2000 [2000/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KONICA CORPORATION 26-2, Nishishinjuku 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/07] | For all designated states KONICA CORPORATION 26-2, Nishishinjuku 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamaya, Yorihiro, c/o Konica Corporation 1 Sakura-machi Hino-shi, Tokyo / JP | [1995/07] | Representative(s) | Watkins, David, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord 30 Welbeck Street London W1G 8ER / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/01] | Watkins, David, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord, 91 Wimpole Street London W1M 8AH / GB | ||
Former [1995/42] | Simpson, Alison Elizabeth Fraser, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord, 91 Wimpole Street London W1M 8AH / GB | ||
Former [1995/07] | Brock, Peter William Urquhart-Dykes & Lord 1 Richfield Place Richfield Avenue Reading RG1 8EQ Berkshire / GB | Application number, filing date | 94305482.5 | 25.07.1994 | [1995/07] | Priority number, date | JP19930198545 | 10.08.1993 Original published format: JP 19854593 | [1995/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0638840 | Date: | 15.02.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.10.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G03C1/09, G03C1/005, G03C1/015 | [1995/07] | CPC: |
G03C1/0051 (EP,US);
G03C1/015 (EP,US);
G03C1/09 (EP,US);
G03C1/07 (EP,US);
G03C1/18 (EP,US);
G03C2001/0153 (EP,US);
G03C2001/03558 (EP,US);
G03C2001/091 (EP,US);
G03C2001/095 (EP,US);
G03C2001/097 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1995/07] | Title | German: | Photographisches lichtempfindliches Silberhalogenidmaterial | [1995/07] | English: | Silver halide photographic lightsensitive material | [1995/07] | French: | Matériau photographique à l'halogénure d'argent sensible à la lumière | [1995/07] | Examination procedure | 22.02.1995 | Examination requested [1995/16] | 25.06.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.11.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 18.10.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [2000/11] | 28.10.1999 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2000/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1999 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JPH03238444 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND) [X] 1,4-9 * abstract * * page 4, column L, line 22 - line 24 * * page 4, column R, line 36 - page 5, column L, line 38 * * page 6, column R, line 7 - page 7, column L, line 2 * * page 8, column R, line 44 - page 9, column L, line 10 * * page 12; examples SD4,SD6-SD8 * [Y] 2,3; | [Y]EP0458278 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 2,3 * page 7; example I1 * * page 27, line 38 - line 41 * * page 27, line 45 - line 54 * * page 27, line 58 - page 29, line 6 * * page 44, line 50 - page 45, line 16 * * page 52, line 22 - line 45 *; | [Y]GB1154236 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [Y] 3 * page 1, line 41 - page 2, line 124 * |