EP0637499 - Process for producing biaxially drawn plastic bottles having excellent heat resistance and apparatus therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.12.1998 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.01.1999 [1999/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYO SEIKAN KAISHA, LTD. 3-1, Uchisaiwai-cho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/06] | For all designated states TOYO SEIKAN KAISHA, LTD. 3-1, Uchisaiwai-cho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kato, Nobuyuki 703 Sharman-Yokohama-Nakayama, 330-4, Nakayama-cho Midori-ku, Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Matsuno, Kenji H-705, Yokohama-park-town, 3-85-6, Mutsukawa Minami-ku, Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 03 /
Maruhashi, Yoshitsugu 6-35-5, Hiyoshi-honcho, Kohoku-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 04 /
Kurashima, Hideo 3-26-16, Iwato Yokosuka-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 05 /
Ikegami, Hiroo 3-5-21, Nishi-hashimoto Sagamihara-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 06 /
Iida, Setsuko 1-22-1, Fujigaoka, Midori-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 07 /
Takeuchi, Kimio 2297-5, Nogawa, Miyamae-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1995/06] | Representative(s) | Rickard, Timothy Mark Adrian Brookes & Martin High Holborn House 52/54 High Holborn London WC1V 6SE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/06] | Rickard, Timothy Mark Adrian Brookes & Martin, High Holborn House, 52/54 High Holborn London WC1V 6SE / GB | Application number, filing date | 94305607.7 | 28.07.1994 | [1995/06] | Priority number, date | JP19930185684 | 28.07.1993 Original published format: JP 18568493 | [1995/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0637499 | Date: | 08.02.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.11.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B29C49/64, B29C49/12, B29C49/16, B29C49/36, B29C49/68 | [1995/06] | CPC: |
B29C49/36 (EP,US);
B29C49/12 (EP,US);
B29C49/6409 (EP,US);
B29C49/642 (EP,US);
B29C49/6472 (EP,US);
B29C49/68 (EP,US);
B29C2035/0822 (EP,US);
B29C2049/7879 (EP);
B29C2949/0715 (EP);
B29C49/06 (EP,US);
B29C49/087 (EP);
B29C49/1222 (EP,US);
B29C49/42097 (EP);
B29C49/42832 (EP);
B29C49/6605 (EP);
B29C49/66055 (EP);
B29C49/6835 (EP);
B29K2067/00 (EP,US);
B29K2995/0017 (EP,US);
B29K2995/004 (EP,US);
B29K2995/0041 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1995/06] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung biaxial gedernter Flaschen, die eine ausgezeichnete Wärmebeständigkeit aufweisen und Vorrichtung dazu | [1995/06] | English: | Process for producing biaxially drawn plastic bottles having excellent heat resistance and apparatus therefor | [1995/06] | French: | Procédé de production de bouteilles biaxialement étirées ayant une excellente résistance à la chaleur et dispositif pour sa mise en oeuvre | [1995/06] | Examination procedure | 06.07.1995 | Examination requested [1995/35] | 29.01.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.07.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.07.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/04] | 24.08.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1999/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1998 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2004805 (GILDEMEISTER CORPOPLAST GMBH) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]EP0086652 (YOSHINO KOGYOSHO CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,6,7 * figure - *; | [Y]GB2138735 (SPIESS & SOHN KUNSTSTOFFWERK G) [Y] 1-8,10-15 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2550990 (COLGATE PALMOLIVE CO [US]) [A] * figure - *; | [DY]EP0237459 (SIDEL SA [FR]) [DY] 1-8,10-15 * abstract *; | [A]US4790741 (TAKAKUSAKI NOBUYUKI [JP], et al) [A] * figure - *; | [A]EP0425360 (NISSEI ASB MACHINE CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]US5128091 (AGUR ENNO E [CA], et al) [A] * figure - *; | [PA]EP0559103 (NISSEI ASB MACHINE CO LTD [JP]) [PA] 1,11-15 * figure - *; | [PA]EP0571262 (SIDEL SA [FR]) [PA] 1,11-15 * abstract * |