EP0638486 - Cartridge and method for the preparation of whipped beverages [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.08.1997 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.10.1997 [1997/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KRAFT JACOBS SUCHARD LTD. St. George's House, Bayshill Road Cheltenham Glos, GL50 3AE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/38] | For all designated states KRAFT JACOBS SUCHARD LTD. St. George's House, Bayshill Road Cheltenham, Glos, GL50 3AE / GB | ||
Former [1995/07] | For all designated states GENERAL FOODS LIMITED Banbury Oxon, OX16 7QU / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gibbs, Andrew Robert 16 Dale Street, Royal Leamington Spa Warwickshire CV32 5HJ / GB | 02 /
Ferguson, James 26 Brookside Way, Bloxham Banbury, Oxon OX15 4HY / GB | 03 /
Holley, Edward John Shieling, Claydon Banbury, Oxon OX17 1EV / GB | 04 /
MacMahon, Alistair John 12 Westminster Croft, Brackley Northants NN13 7ED / GB | [1995/07] | Representative(s) | Allard, Susan Joyce, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/07] | Allard, Susan Joyce, et al BOULT, WADE & TENNANT 27 Furnival Street London EC4A 1PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 94305730.7 | 02.08.1994 | [1995/07] | Priority number, date | GB19930016717 | 11.08.1993 Original published format: GB 9316717 | [1995/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0638486 | Date: | 15.02.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0638486 | Date: | 23.10.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.11.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B65D81/34 | [1995/07] | CPC: |
A47J43/12 (EP);
A47J31/00 (KR);
B65D85/8055 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1995/07] | Title | German: | Patrone und Verfahren zur Zubereitung von verschäumten Getränken | [1995/07] | English: | Cartridge and method for the preparation of whipped beverages | [1995/07] | French: | Cartouche et méthode pour la préparation de boissons fouettées | [1995/07] | Examination procedure | 06.03.1995 | Examination requested [1995/18] | 29.09.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.12.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.04.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.07.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 22.07.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.07.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0455337 (GEN FOODS KRAFT LTD [GB]) [AD] 1,7-12,14-17,22* the whole document * |