EP0638770 - Temperature detector and control for an igniter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.02.1997 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.02.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.04.1997 [1997/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIMMONDS PRECISION ENGINE SYSTEMS, INC. 250 N. Cleveland-Massillon Road Akron Ohio 44334-0501 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/07] | For all designated states SIMMONDS PRECISION ENGINE SYSTEMS, INC. 250 N. Cleveland-Massillon Road Akron, Ohio 44334-0501 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DeFreitas, Dennis Michael RD No. 2, Box 190 Oxford, New York 13830 / US | [1995/07] | Representative(s) | Foster, David Martyn, et al Mathisen & Macara LLP 120 Bridge Road Chertsey Surrey KT16 8LA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/07] | Foster, David Martyn, et al MATHISEN MACARA & CO. The Coach House 6-8 Swakeleys Road Ickenham Uxbridge UB10 8BZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 94305756.2 | 03.08.1994 | [1995/07] | Priority number, date | US19930103021 | 06.08.1993 Original published format: US 103021 | [1995/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0638770 | Date: | 15.02.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.11.1994 | Classification | IPC: | F23N5/08, F02C7/266 | [1995/07] | CPC: |
F02C7/266 (EP,US);
F23N5/082 (EP,US);
F23N2227/38 (EP,US);
F23N2227/42 (EP,US);
F23N5/24 (EP,US);
F23N5/26 (EP,US);
Y02T50/60 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1995/07] | Title | German: | Temperaturfühler und Steuerung für einen Zünder | [1995/07] | English: | Temperature detector and control for an igniter | [1995/07] | French: | Détecteur de température et commande pour un allumeur | [1995/07] | Examination procedure | 14.07.1995 | Examination requested [1995/37] | 28.05.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.10.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/15] | 08.11.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1997/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS59229059 ; | [XA]US3434788 (WRIGHT JAMES A) [X] 1,14,19 * column W * [A] 10; | [XA]US3537804 (WALBRIDGE LYMAN H) [X] 1,14,19 * column W * [A] 10; | [AD]US4825658 (BEEBE KENNETH W [US]) [AD] 2,3,11,18,21 * column A *; | [A]DE1084977 (SNECMA) [A] 3,4,11,18,21 * the whole document *; | [A]JPS63100340 ; | [A]JPH01267366 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850511), vol. 9, no. 107, Database accession no. (M - 378), & JP59229059 A 19841222 (TOYOTA JIDOSHA) [X] 1,5-7,14-17,19,20,22-25,27 * abstract * * figure . * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880913), vol. 12, no. 341, Database accession no. (P - 758), & JP63100340 A 19880502 (FUJI ELECTRIC) [A] 8,9,12,13 * abstract * * figure . * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900119), vol. 14, no. 29, Database accession no. (M - 922), & JP01267366 A 19891025 (MAZDA MOTOR) [A] 28,29 * abstract * * figure . * |