EP0643971 - Antifungal compositions consisting of an antifungal agent, e.g. antibiotic R-106I, and a fungal MDR inhibitor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.09.1999 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.09.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.11.1999 [1999/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELI LILLY AND COMPANY Lilly Corporate Center Indianapolis, IN 46285 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/12] | For all designated states ELI LILLY AND COMPANY Lilly Corporate Center Indianapolis, Indiana 46285 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Peery, Robert Brown 372 Sycamore Street Brownsburg, Indiana 46112 / US | 02 /
Skatrud, Paul Luther 2412 Lake Crossing Greenwood, Indiana 46143 / US | [1995/12] | Representative(s) | Tapping, Kenneth George, et al Lilly Industries Limited European Patent Operations Erl Wood Manor Windlesham Surrey GU20 6PH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/12] | Tapping, Kenneth George, et al Lilly Industries Limited European Patent Operations Erl Wood Manor Windlesham Surrey GU20 6PH / GB | Application number, filing date | 94306122.6 | 19.08.1994 | [1995/12] | Priority number, date | US19930111680 | 25.08.1993 Original published format: US 111680 | [1995/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0643971 | Date: | 22.03.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0643971 | Date: | 29.05.1996 | [1996/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.04.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/02, A61K38/12, // (A61K38/02, 31:135, 31:475, 31:54) | [1996/20] | CPC: |
A61K38/12 (EP,KR);
A61K31/275 (KR);
A61K31/475 (KR);
A61K31/54 (KR);
A61K2300/00 (KR)
| C-Set: |
A61K38/12, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K38/12, A61K31/275 (EP);
A61K38/12, A61K31/475 (EP);
A61K38/12, A61K31/54 (EP) |
Former IPC [1995/12] | A61K38/02, // (A61K38/02, 31:135, 31:475, 31:54) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1995/12] | Extension states | LT | 27.08.1994 | SI | 27.08.1994 | Title | German: | Antifungal Zusammensetzungen bestehend aus einem antifungalem Mittel, z.B. Antibiotikum R-106I, und einem Hemmer der fungalen MDR | [1995/12] | English: | Antifungal compositions consisting of an antifungal agent, e.g. antibiotic R-106I, and a fungal MDR inhibitor | [1995/12] | French: | Compositions antifongiques contenant un agent antifongique, e.g. antibiotique R-106I, et un inhibiteur MDR fongique | [1995/12] | Examination procedure | 27.08.1994 | Examination requested [1995/12] | 03.01.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.06.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.01.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.05.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/44] | 11.06.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1999/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1998 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   08.10.1998 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0352092 (TAKARA SHUZO CO [JP]) [Y] 2,6* page 2, line 1 - line 45 *; | [Y]EP0500264 (TAKARA SHUZO CO [JP]) [Y] 2,6 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9311668 (RUSH PRESBYTERIAN ST LUKE [US]) [X] 1 * claims 31,34,37,40 *; | [XY] - KRAJEWSKA-KULAK, E. ET AL, "Effects of the combination of ketoconazole and calcium channel antagonists against Candida albicans in vitro", ARZNEIM.-FORSCH. (1993), 43(7), 782-3, (1993), XP002000117 [X] 1,3-5,7-9 * abstract * [Y] 2,6 | [X] - J.L. WEAVER ET AL., "The effect of ion channel blockers, immunosuppressive agents, and other drugs on the activity of the multi-drug transporter", INT. J. CANCER, (199304), vol. 54, no. 4, pages 456 - 461, XP002000126 [X] 1,3-5,7-9 * abstract * | [X] - BIBIKOVA, M. V. ET AL, "A system for screening natural immunosuppressors", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19910610), vol. 114, no. 23, Database accession no. 220631, XP002000118 [X] 1,3,10 * abstract * |