EP0654737 - Method and apparatus for controlling command retry [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.10.2000 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.10.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.11.2000 [2000/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/21] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamashita, Hideo, c/o Fujitsu Limited 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP | 02 /
Matsuzaki, Shigeharu, c/o Fujitsu Limited 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP | [1995/21] | Representative(s) | Fane, Christopher Robin King, et al Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/21] | Fane, Christopher Robin King, et al HASELTINE LAKE & CO. Hazlitt House 28 Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane London, WC2A 1AT / GB | Application number, filing date | 94306306.5 | 26.08.1994 | [1995/21] | Priority number, date | JP19930290447 | 19.11.1993 Original published format: JP 29044793 | [1995/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0654737 | Date: | 24.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0654737 | Date: | 08.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G06F11/14 | [1995/21] | CPC: |
G06F11/141 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1995/21] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Steuerung der Befehlswiederholung | [1995/21] | English: | Method and apparatus for controlling command retry | [1995/21] | French: | Méthode et appareil pour commander la répétition de l'exécution d'une instruction | [1995/21] | Examination procedure | 25.07.1995 | Examination requested [1995/38] | 11.03.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.06.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.08.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 30.08.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.09.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4045661 (ANTOINE PIERRE GABRIEL, et al) [X] 1-8 * column 16, line 56 - column 17, line 15 * * column 17, line 63 - column 18, line 13; figure 4 * |