EP0640772 - Clutch release assembly for a friction clutch [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.01.1998 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.01.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.02.1998 [1998/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DANA CORPORATION 4500 Dorr Street Toledo, OH 43615 / US | [1995/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gochenour, Daniel V. 1411 Davidson Court Auburn, Indiana 46706 / US | 02 /
Tarlton, Sr., James K. 3623 County Road Auburn, Indiana 46706 / US | 03 /
Arend, Matthew R. 902-1 Haver Drive Hicksville, Ohio 43526 / US | [1995/09] | Representative(s) | Cheyne, John Robert Alexander M., et al Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/09] | Cheyne, John Robert Alexander Mackenzie, et al HASELTINE LAKE & CO. 28 Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane London WC2A 1AT / GB | Application number, filing date | 94306396.6 | 31.08.1994 | [1995/09] | Priority number, date | US19930114563 | 31.08.1993 Original published format: US 114563 | [1995/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0640772 | Date: | 01.03.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0640772 | Date: | 05.03.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.12.1994 | Classification | IPC: | F16D13/71 | [1995/09] | CPC: |
F16D13/48 (EP,KR,US);
F16D2300/12 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, SE [1995/09] | Title | German: | Kupplungs-Ausrück-Zusammenbau für eine Reibungskupplung | [1995/09] | English: | Clutch release assembly for a friction clutch | [1995/09] | French: | Assemblage à relâcher d'embrayage pour un embrayage à friction | [1995/09] | Examination procedure | 29.08.1995 | Examination requested [1995/43] | 12.04.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 19.08.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 22.08.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.11.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 19.11.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.12.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2594506 (DAIKIN MFG CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1; | [A]DE1575830 (DANA CORP.) [A] 1; | [A]EP0338763 (DANA CORP [US]) [A] 1; | [A]GB2131898 (DANA CORP) [A] 1; | [A]FR2608707 (DANA CORP [US]) [A] 1 |