EP0643355 - Apparatus and method for subdivision of solids [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.06.2002 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2004 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 25.08.2004 [2004/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/11] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Meshkat, Siaviash N. 7061 Bret Harte Drive San Jose, California 95120 / US | 02 /
Meshkat, Susan Ann 7061 Bret Harte Drive San Jose, California 95120 / US | [1995/11] | Representative(s) | Williams, Julian David IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Mail Point 110 Hursley Park, Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/11] | Williams, Julian David IBM United Kingdom Limited, Intellectual Property Department, Hursley Park Winchester, Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | Application number, filing date | 94306542.5 | 06.09.1994 | [1995/11] | Priority number, date | US19930119755 | 10.09.1993 Original published format: US 119755 | [1995/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0643355 | Date: | 15.03.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0643355 | Date: | 02.10.1996 | [1996/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0643355 | Date: | 01.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.08.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G06T17/20 | [2000/43] | CPC: |
G06T17/20 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1995/11] | G06F17/20 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1995/11] | Title | German: | Gerät und Methode zur Unterteilung von Festkörpern | [1995/11] | English: | Apparatus and method for subdivision of solids | [1995/11] | French: | Appareil et méthode pour la subdivision de solides | [1995/11] | Examination procedure | 14.07.1995 | Examination requested [1995/36] | 15.02.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.06.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 08.12.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.01.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.02.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 08.02.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 01.08.2001 | DE | 03.11.2001 | [2004/35] |
Former [2003/17] | DE | 03.11.2001 | |
FR | 28.12.2001 | ||
Former [2002/18] | FR | 28.12.2001 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0447224 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [A] 1,16 * column A; figure 3 *; | [DA]US4797842 (NACKMAN LEE R [US], et al) [DA] 1,16 * column W *; | [DA]US5125038 (MESHKAT SIAVASH N [US], et al) [DA] 1,16 * column W *; | [A]WO8907301 (MENTOR GRAPHICS CORP [US]) [A] 1,16 * the whole document * | [A] - SRINIVASAN ET AL, "Automatic Mesh Generation Using the Symmetric Axis Transformation of Polygonal Domains", PROCEEDINGS OF THE IEEE, NEW YORK, (199209), vol. 80, no. 9, pages 1485 - 1501, XP002009719 [A] 1,16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/5.163413 | [DA] - KELA ET AL, "A Hierarchical Structure for Automatic Meshing and Adaptive FEM Analysis", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON RELIABILITY OF METHODS FOR ENGINEERING ANALYSIS, SWANSEA, UK, (198607), pages 103 - 120, XP002009720 [DA] 1,16 * the whole document * |