EP0643116 - Low voc (volatile organic compounds), solvent-based CPVC pipe adhesives which maintain joint adhesive performance [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.05.1997 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.06.1997 [1997/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IPS CORPORATION 17109 South Main Street Gardena California 90248 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/11] | For all designated states IPS CORPORATION 17109 South Main Street Gardena, California 90248 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Patel, Naresh D. 9223 Paso Robles Avenue Northridge CA 91325 / US | 02 /
Brown, Mark W. 9216 Tweedy Lane Downey CA 90240 / US | [1995/11] | Representative(s) | Jones, Stephen Anthony, et al Lewis & Taylor 144 New Walk Leicester LE1 7JA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/11] | Jones, Stephen Anthony, et al E. N. Lewis & Taylor 144 New Walk Leicester LE1 7JA / GB | Application number, filing date | 94306715.7 | 13.09.1994 | [1995/11] | Priority number, date | US19930122139 | 15.09.1993 Original published format: US 122139 | [1995/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0643116 | Date: | 15.03.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0643116 | Date: | 20.03.1996 | [1996/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C09J11/06, C09J127/24 | [1996/11] | CPC: |
C09J127/24 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1995/11] | C09J11/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1995/11] | Extension states | SI | 30.09.1994 | Title | German: | CPVC-Rohr-Klebstoffe auf Basis von Lösungsmitteln mit einem geringen Anteil an flüchtigen organischen Verbindungen, welche ihre Klebebindungseigenschaften aufrechterhalten | [1995/11] | English: | Low voc (volatile organic compounds), solvent-based CPVC pipe adhesives which maintain joint adhesive performance | [1995/11] | French: | Adhésifs pour tuyaux en CPV chloré à base de solvants à basse teneur en composés organiques volatils conservant l'effet adhésif dans le joint | [1995/11] | File destroyed: | 13.09.2003 | Examination procedure | 21.09.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/26] | 27.01.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1997/26] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 12.11.1996 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1996 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9316130 (PATEL ET AL.) [X] 1-5; | [X]EP0315858 (HENKEL KOMMANDITGESELL- SCHAFT AUF AKTIEN) [X] 1-5; | [X]EP0547593 (OATEY COMPANY) [X] 1-5 | [X] - DATABASE WPI, Derwent World Patents Index [X] 1 |