EP0645166 - Drain system for slant top video game cabinets [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.08.2003 [2003/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WMS GAMING, INC. 3401 North California Avenue Chicago, Illinois 60618 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/13] | For all designated states WMS GAMING, INC. 3401 North California Avenue Chicago, Illinois 60618 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rothschild, Wayne H. 60, East Jeffery Avenue Wheeling, Illinois 60090 / US | 02 /
Tastad, Gregory J. 1658 North 40th Avenue Stone Park Illinois 60165 / US | [1995/13] | Representative(s) | Allman, Peter John, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Sussex House 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester M2 3LG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/13] | Allman, Peter John, et al MARKS & CLERK, Sussex House, 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester M2 3LG / GB | Application number, filing date | 94306772.8 | 15.09.1994 | [1995/13] | Priority number, date | US19930122217 | 17.09.1993 Original published format: US 122217 | [1995/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0645166 | Date: | 29.03.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0645166 | Date: | 31.07.1996 | [1996/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0645166 | Date: | 14.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.06.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A63F13/08 | [2002/32] | CPC: |
G07F17/3216 (EP,US);
A63F13/90 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1995/13] | A63F9/22 | Designated contracting states | AT, FR, GB, NL [1995/13] | Title | German: | Drainageeinrichtung für ein geneigt angeordnetes Videospielgehäuse | [1995/13] | English: | Drain system for slant top video game cabinets | [1995/13] | French: | Système de drainage pour meuble de jeu vidéo incliné | [1995/13] | Examination procedure | 16.01.1997 | Examination requested [1997/12] | 01.10.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.04.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.06.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.12.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.01.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.04.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 10.04.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.08.2002 | NL | 14.08.2002 | [2003/31] |
Former [2003/08] | NL | 14.08.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4133530 (TAKAICHI PETER L, et al); | [A]US4440457 (FOGELMAN H FRANK [US], et al); | [A]DD267862 (NUMERIK KARL MARX VEB [DD]); | [A]EP0387880 (INAX CORP [JP]); | [A]US5211405 (SHELTON RICHARD B [US], et al) |