EP0645172 - Method and catalyst for treating exhaust gases containing dioxines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.01.2004 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.03.2004 [2004/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states N.E. Chemcat Corporation 4-1, 2-chome, Hamamatsu-cho Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | For all designated states NKK CORPORATION 1-2 Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/13] | For all designated states N.E. CHEMCAT CORPORATION 4-1, 2-chome, Hamamatsu-cho Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | ||
For all designated states NKK CORPORATION 1-2 Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sakurai, Toshihiko 20-9, Higashi 1-chome Kunitachi-shi, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Iwasaki, Toshihiko 2-21-6, Mukougaoka Bunkyo-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Shibuya, Eiichi 2-5-2, Higashi-nakanobu Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1995/13] | Representative(s) | Jones, Helen M.M. Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/50] | Jones, Helen Marjorie Meredith Gill Jennings & Every, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | ||
Former [1995/13] | Peet, Jillian Wendy Gill Jennings & Every Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 94306997.1 | 26.09.1994 | [1995/13] | Priority number, date | JP19930261723 | 24.09.1993 Original published format: JP 26172393 | [1995/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0645172 | Date: | 29.03.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0645172 | Date: | 19.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.01.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/70, A62D3/00, B01J21/02, B01J23/89, B01D53/86 | [1995/13] | CPC: |
B01J23/40 (EP,KR,US);
B01D53/8659 (EP,US);
B01D53/8662 (EP,KR,US);
B01D53/8668 (EP,KR,US);
B01D2257/2045 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, DK, FR, IT, LI, SE [1995/13] | Title | German: | Methode und Katalysator zur Behandlung von Dioxinen enthaltenden Rauchgasen | [1995/13] | English: | Method and catalyst for treating exhaust gases containing dioxines | [1995/13] | French: | Méthode et catalyseur pour le traitement des effluents gazeux contenant des dioxines | [1995/13] | Examination procedure | 15.09.1995 | Examination requested [1995/47] | 21.12.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.03.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.03.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.07.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.09.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.12.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 27.12.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.12.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1485375 (NAT RES DEV) [A] 1-3; | [DA]EP0402122 (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP], et al)[DA] 1-12; | [A]WO9117828 (UNIV AKRON [US]) [A] 1-11 * examples 1-7; claims 1-51 *; | [A]EP0485787 (TOSOH CORP [JP]) [A] 1,2,4-8 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0488331 (HIRAOKA MASAKATSU [JP], et al) [A] 1,2,4-9 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0493803 (N E CHEMCAT CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1,4,5,7,9 * page 3 - page 8; claims 1-10 * | Examination | US4566267 | US4795732 | WO9113130 | EP0470659 | EP0499644 | EP0547226 |