EP0646502 - Vehicle safety harness [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.04.1998 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.06.1998 [1998/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carstyle Safety Products Ltd. 34 Gratton Road, Queens Park Bedford MK40 4EF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/14] | For all designated states Carstyle Safety Products Ltd. 34 Gratton Road, Queens Park Bedford MK40 4EF / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lennox-Lamb, Carey 97 Bedford Road Wootton Bedfordshire MK43 9JB / GB | [1995/14] | Representative(s) | Howden, Christopher A. FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/14] | Howden, Christopher Andrew FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 D-80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94307046.6 | 27.09.1994 | [1995/14] | Priority number, date | GB19930020195 | 30.09.1993 Original published format: GB 9320195 | [1995/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0646502 | Date: | 05.04.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0646502 | Date: | 10.01.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B60R22/10 | [1995/14] | CPC: |
B60R22/105 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL [1995/14] | Title | German: | Sicherheitsgeschirr für Fahrzeuge | [1995/14] | English: | Vehicle safety harness | [1995/14] | French: | Harnais de sécurité pour véhicule | [1995/14] | Examination procedure | 09.07.1996 | Examination requested [1996/36] | 31.07.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.12.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/24] | 15.01.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1998/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3099486 (SCOTT) [X] 1,3 * column 1, line 53 - column 2, line 14 *; | [X]DE9301819U (THYSSEN) [X] 1,3 * page 7, line 14 - page 8, line 17 *; | [A]US3954280 (ROBERTS ET AL) [A] 1-3 * column 2, line 12 - line 39 *; | [A]US4927211 (BOLCEREK) [A] 1-3 * figure 1 * |