EP0646344 - Sandwich toaster [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.05.1996 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.06.1996 [1996/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BREVILLE PTY LTD. 149 Pyrmont Street Pyrmont New South Wales 2009 / AU | [N/P] |
Former [1995/14] | For all designated states BREVILLE PTY LTD. 149 Pyrmont Street Pyrmont, New South Wales 2009 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
McClean, Stephen John 93 Shorter Avenue, Beverly Hills New South Wales, 2209 / AU | [1995/14] | Representative(s) | Tribe, Thomas Geoffrey, et al fJ Cleveland 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/14] | Tribe, Thomas Geoffrey, et al F.J. Cleveland & Company 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 94307122.5 | 29.09.1994 | [1995/14] | Priority number, date | AU1993PM01633 | 05.10.1993 Original published format: AU PM163393 | [1995/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0646344 | Date: | 05.04.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A47J37/08, A47J37/06 | [1995/14] | CPC: |
A47J37/0611 (EP);
A47J37/0864 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB [1995/14] | Title | German: | Toaster für Sandwich | [1995/14] | English: | Sandwich toaster | [1995/14] | French: | Toasteur pour sandwichs | [1995/14] | File destroyed: | 13.09.2003 | Examination procedure | 06.10.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/26] | 02.02.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1996/26] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]AU3409393D (BREVILLE R & D PTY. LTD.) [Y] 1,3,4; | [PY]EP0578360 (BREVILLE R & D PTY. LTD.) [PY] 1,3,4 * column 2, line 27 - column 4, line 49; figure 2 *; | [Y]DE2510227 (FA. ROBERT KRUPS) [Y] 1,3,4 * page 4, line 1 - page 6, paragraph L; figure - *; | [A]EP0529572 (BRAUN AG) [A] 1 * column 3, line 33 - column 5, line 43; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US4396825 (COX. ET AL) [A] 1 * column 3, line 32 - column 8, line 25; figures 2,4-6 *; | [A]US5126534 (KWONG) [A] 1 * column 2, line 66 - column 8, line 28; figure 2 *; | [A]EP0201818 (BRAUN AG) [A] 1 * column 3, line 39 - column 13, line 44; figures 2-6 *; | [A]EP0563000 (MAVRIDIS) [A] 3,4 * column W * |