EP0649245 - A method of reducing the size of an image of a document [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1995/16] | A method of reducing document size for digital display | ||
[1998/52] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.10.1999 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.12.1999 [1999/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AT&T Corp. 32 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10013-2412 / US | [1995/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
O'Gorman, Lawrence Patrick 18 Albright Circle Madison, New Jersey 07940 / US | [1995/16] | Representative(s) | Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk, et al Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex IG8 0TU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/16] | Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk, et al AT&T (UK) LTD., AT&T Intellectual Property Division, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green, Essex IG8 0TU / GB | Application number, filing date | 94307276.9 | 05.10.1994 | [1995/16] | Priority number, date | US19930138153 | 15.10.1993 Original published format: US 138153 | [1995/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0649245 | Date: | 19.04.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0649245 | Date: | 23.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/393 | [1995/16] | CPC: |
H04N1/3935 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1995/16] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Verkleinerung des Bildes eines Dokuments | [1998/52] | English: | A method of reducing the size of an image of a document | [1998/52] | French: | Procédé pour réduire la dimension d'une image d'un document | [1998/52] |
Former [1995/16] | Verfahren zum Reduzieren der Dokumentengrösse zur numerischer Anzeige | ||
Former [1995/16] | A method of reducing document size for digital display | ||
Former [1995/16] | Procédé pour réduire la dimension d'un document pour l'affichage numérique | Examination procedure | 05.10.1995 | Examination requested [1995/48] | 08.10.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.12.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 18.05.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 10.06.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.08.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 28.08.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.09.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4412252 (MOORE ROBERT S [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * column 1, line 32 - line 50 * * column A; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0177640 (IBM [US]) [A] 1-9 * page 4, paragraph 2 * * abstract * |