EP0648658 - Electrically operated parking brake system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.05.1999 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.06.1999 [1999/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eaton Corporation Eaton Center, 1111 Superior Avenue Cleveland, Ohio 44114-2584 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/42] | For all designated states EATON CORPORATION Eaton Center, 1111 Superior Avenue Cleveland, Ohio 44114-2584 / US | ||
Former [1995/16] | For all designated states EATON CORPORATION Eaton Center, 1111 Superior Avenue Cleveland Ohio 44114 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Edelen, Stephen Alton 293 Lakeshore Drive Battle Creek, Michigan 49015 / US | 02 /
Jones, Robert Wayne 41774 Village Green Boulevard, West Apt. No. 201 Canton, Michigan 48187 / US | [1995/16] | Representative(s) | Douglas, John Andrew Eaton House Staines Road Hounslow Middlesex TW4 5DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/16] | Douglas, John Andrew Eaton House Staines Road Hounslow Middlesex TW4 5DX / GB | Application number, filing date | 94307281.9 | 05.10.1994 | [1995/16] | Priority number, date | US19930135901 | 12.10.1993 Original published format: US 135901 | [1995/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0648658 | Date: | 19.04.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0648658 | Date: | 08.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.01.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B60T13/68 | [1995/16] | CPC: |
B60T13/686 (EP,US);
B60T13/22 (EP,US);
F16H63/48 (EP,US);
F16H2059/746 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1995/16] | Title | German: | Elektrisch betriebenes Park-Bremssystem | [1995/16] | English: | Electrically operated parking brake system | [1995/16] | French: | Système de freinage de stationnement actionné par l'électricité | [1995/16] | Examination procedure | 04.10.1995 | Examination requested [1995/48] | 30.10.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.03.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.08.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 12.12.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 13.01.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.02.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 02.02.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.04.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3802745 (STRIFLER P, et al) [A] 1; | [A]EP0203894 (WABCO WESTINGHOUSE SPA [IT]) [A] 1; | [A]US5040851 (MAEBA EIJI [JP]) [A] 1; | [PA]US5294190 (FELDMANN JOACHIM [DE], et al)[PA] 1 |