EP0653224 - Apparatus for classifying heart rhythms by means of electrogram morphology [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1995/20] | A method of classifying heart rhythms by means of electrogram morphology | ||
[2003/20] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.11.2004 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PACESETTER, INC. 15900 Valley View Court Sylmar, CA 91342 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/01] | For all designated states Pacesetter, Inc. 15900 Valley View Court Sylmar, CA 91342 / US | ||
Former [1995/20] | For all designated states TELECTRONICS N.V. De Ruyterkade 58A P.O. Box 837 Curaçao / AN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Murphy, Anthony Joseph 2/2 Piper Street Annandale 2038 / AU | 02 /
Bassin, David 52 Dolphin Street Coogee, N.S.W. 2034 / AU | 03 /
Wickham, John Peter 20 Hampden Road Fivedock, N.S.W. 2046 / AU | [1995/20] | Representative(s) | Hackett, Sean James, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Alpha Tower Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Hackett, Sean James, et al Marks & Clerk Alpha Tower Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | ||
Former [2000/16] | Hackett, Sean James, et al Marks & Clerk, Patent Attorneys, Alpha Tower, Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | ||
Former [1995/20] | Hackett, Sean James MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 94307674.5 | 19.10.1994 | [1995/20] | Priority number, date | US19930141805 | 22.10.1993 Original published format: US 141805 | [1995/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0653224 | Date: | 17.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0653224 | Date: | 27.12.1996 | [1996/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0653224 | Date: | 02.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/365, A61N1/368, A61N1/39 | [1995/20] | CPC: |
A61N1/3956 (EP,US);
A61B5/35 (EP,US);
A61B5/7264 (EP,US);
G16H50/20 (EP);
Y10S128/925 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1995/20] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Klassifizieren von Herzrhythmen basierend auf der Morphologie des Elektrogramms | [2003/20] | English: | Apparatus for classifying heart rhythms by means of electrogram morphology | [2003/20] | French: | Dispositif de classification des rythmes cardiaques d'après la forme des électrogrammes | [2003/20] |
Former [1995/20] | Verfahren zum Klassifizieren von Herzrhythmen aufgrund der Form des Elektrogrammes | ||
Former [1995/20] | A method of classifying heart rhythms by means of electrogram morphology | ||
Former [1995/20] | Méthode de classification des rythmes cardiaques d'après la forme des électrogrammes | Examination procedure | 07.07.1995 | Examination requested [1995/36] | 19.12.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.04.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.08.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.08.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 05.08.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4972835 (CARROLL KENNETH J [US], et al) [A] 1,5,6 * column 3, line 37 - column 4, line 42 *; | [X]EP0506230 (VENTRITEX INC [US]) [X] 1-3,5,6,10 * column W *; | [PA]WO9402201 (CRYOGENIC TECHNOLOGY LTD [GB], et al) [PA] 1-4* the whole document *; | [PA]EP0601775 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [PA] 1-10 * column 6, line 21 - column 26, line 18 *; | [PA]US5351696 (RIFF KENNETH M [US], et al) [PA] 1-13 * column W * |