EP0649936 - Fabric treated with polymer dispersion to reduce porosity [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.06.1998 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MILLIKEN RESEARCH CORPORATION Post Office Box 1927 Spartanburg South Carolina 29304 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/17] | For all designated states MILLIKEN RESEARCH CORPORATION Post Office Box 1927 Spartanburg South Carolina 29304 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Parker, Richard Henry 657 Lakewood Drive LaGrange, GA 30240, (County of Troup) / US | [1995/17] | Representative(s) | Ouzman, Beverley Nicola Claire, et al Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Ouzman, Beverley Nicola Claire, et al Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | ||
Former [1995/17] | Ouzman, Beverley Nicola Claire, et al Murgitroyd and Company, 373 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8QA / GB | Application number, filing date | 94307729.7 | 20.10.1994 | [1995/17] | Priority number, date | US19930139798 | 21.10.1993 Original published format: US 139798 | [1995/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0649936 | Date: | 26.04.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0649936 | Date: | 13.08.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.1995 | Classification | IPC: | D06N3/04, D06N3/00, B60R21/16 | [1995/17] | CPC: |
B60R21/235 (EP);
D06M15/227 (KR);
D03D1/02 (EP);
D06N3/045 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1995/17] | Title | German: | Mit Polymerisatdispersion behandelte Gewebe zur Reduzierung der Porosität | [1997/33] | English: | Fabric treated with polymer dispersion to reduce porosity | [1995/17] | French: | Tissu traité par une dispersion de polymère pour réduire la porosité | [1995/17] |
Former [1995/17] | Mit Polymerisatdispersion behandelte Gewebe zur Reduziering der Porosität | Examination procedure | 09.05.1995 | Examination requested [1995/27] | 25.09.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.11.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.12.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.02.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.03.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 14.03.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.05.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE976286 (FELDMUEHLE AG) [X] 1-3,6-8,13 * the whole document *; | [A]DE1069112 (CHEMISCHE FABRIK KNOELL KG) [A] 1,6,7,13 * column 1, line 10 - line 21 * * column 1, line 51 - column 2, line 20 * * column 2, line 53 - column 3, line 7 *; | [A]US3708332 (CLOSSON A) [A] 1,2,5-9 * column 2, line 27 - column 3, line 25; example 2; claim - *; | [PA]US5284677 (COUGHLIN THOMAS E [US]) [PA] 1,2,5-7,11,13 * column W *; | [DA]US3705645 (KONEN PATRICIA F) [DA] 1,11,13,14 * column 4, line 38 - line 43; claims 1,9 * * column 5, line 24 - line 33 * * column 10, line 6 - column 13, line 18 *; | [A]WO9011914 (UNIROYAL PLASTICS [US]) [A] 14 * page 7, paragraph L - page 8, line 23 * * page 10, paragraph L - page 11, line 27 * | Examination | US4292105 |