EP0664486 - Waterborne photoresists having non-ionic fluorocarbon surfactants [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.01.2000 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.01.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.02.2000 [2000/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MORTON INTERNATIONAL, INC. 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago Illinois 60606-1596 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/42] | For all designated states Morton International, Inc. 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, Illinois 60606-1596 / US | ||
Former [1995/30] | For all designated states MORTON INTERNATIONAL, INC. 100 North Riverside Plaza, Randolph Street at the River Chicago, Illinois 60606 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Barr, Robert K. 13 Henley Drive Laguna Niguel, California 92677 / US | [1995/30] | Representative(s) | Bankes, Stephen Charles Digby, et al Baron Warren Redfern 1000 Great West Road Brentford TW8 9DW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/30] | Bankes, Stephen Charles Digby, et al BARON & WARREN 18 South End Kensington London W8 5BU / GB | Application number, filing date | 94307901.2 | 27.10.1994 | [1995/30] | Priority number, date | US19940186875 | 25.01.1994 Original published format: US 186875 | US19940199037 | 18.02.1994 Original published format: US 199037 | US19940223615 | 06.04.1994 Original published format: US 223615 | [1995/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0664486 | Date: | 26.07.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0664486 | Date: | 03.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.06.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/004 | [1995/30] | CPC: |
G03F7/0048 (EP);
G03F7/033 (EP);
H05K3/0076 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1995/30] | Title | German: | Wässrige Emulsionsphotoresiste mit nichtionischen Fluorkohlenwasserstoffenthaltenden oberflächenaktiven Substanzen | [1995/30] | English: | Waterborne photoresists having non-ionic fluorocarbon surfactants | [1995/30] | French: | Photoreserves en émulsion aqueuse contenant des agents tensioactifs fluorocarbonés non-ioniques | [1995/30] | Examination procedure | 20.01.1996 | Examination requested [1996/13] | 01.03.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.08.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.10.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 22.11.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 12.06.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 27.08.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.10.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 29.10.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.12.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3215112 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND [JP]) [A] 1-3* page 7, line 13 *; | JPS6448849 [ ] (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND, et al); | [AD]US5045435 (ADAMS DIANE L [US], et al) [AD] 1-3 * column 8, line 12 * | [A] - T. YAMAMOTO ET AL., "photosensitive compositions for positive-working lithographic printing plates", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19890807), vol. 111, no. 6, Database accession no. 48184, page 617, column 2 [A] 1-3 |