EP0653621 - A process for fabricating a device using an ellipsometric technique [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.02.2001 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AT&T Corp. 32 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10013-2412 / US | [1995/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Blayo, Nadine 3 rue Leon Blum F-56300 Pontivy / FR | 02 /
Ibbotson, Dale Edward 4 Joshua Lane Bridgewater, New Jersey 08807 / US | 03 /
Lee, Tseng-Chung 305 West 98th Street, Apt. 3EN New York, New York 10025 / US | [1995/22] |
Former [1995/20] | 01 /
Blayo, Nadine 129 Mercer Street, Apt. No. 3 Jersey City, New Jersey 07302 / US | ||
02 /
Ibbotson, Dale Edward 4 Joshua Lane Bridgewater, New Jersey 08807 / US | |||
03 /
Lee, Tseng-Chung 305 West 98th Street, Apt. 3EN New York, New York 10025 / US | Representative(s) | Johnston, Kenneth Graham, et al Lucent Technologies EUR-IP UK Ltd Unit 18, Core 3 Workzone Innova Business Park Electric Avenue Enfield, EN3 7XB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/20] | Johnston, Kenneth Graham, et al AT&T (UK) Ltd. 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex, IG8 OTU / GB | Application number, filing date | 94308068.9 | 02.11.1994 | [1995/20] | Priority number, date | US19930152776 | 15.11.1993 Original published format: US 152776 | [1995/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0653621 | Date: | 17.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0653621 | Date: | 12.04.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/21, H01J37/32 | [1995/20] | CPC: |
H01J37/32935 (EP,US);
H01L21/304 (KR);
G01N21/211 (EP,US);
H01J37/32972 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1995/20] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Vorrichtung unter Verwendung einer Ellipsometrietechnik | [1995/20] | English: | A process for fabricating a device using an ellipsometric technique | [1995/20] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'un dispositif utilisant une technique ellipsométrique | [1995/20] | Examination procedure | 02.11.1995 | Examination requested [1995/52] | 03.08.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.02.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.07.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.08.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.10.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.12.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 15.12.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.01.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | |||
Former [2002/13] | DE | 13.07.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US5131752 (YU CHORNG-TAO [US], et al) [DA] 1,7,9* column A; figures 1-5 *; | [DA] - M.HAVERLAG ET AL., "In situ ellipsometry and reflectometry during etching of patterned surfaces: Experiments and simulations", JOURNAL OF VACUUM SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY: PART B, NEW YORK US, (199211), vol. 10, no. 6, doi:doi:10.1116/1.586076, pages 2412 - 2418, XP000331696 [DA] 1,2,4,5,7-9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1116/1.586076 | [DA] - S.A.HENCK, "In situ spectral ellipsometry for real-time thickness measurement: Etching multilayer stacks", JOURNAL OF VACUUM SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY: PART A, NEW YORK US, (199307), vol. 11, no. 4, doi:doi:10.1116/1.578490, pages 1179 - 1185, XP000403723 [DA] 1,7 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1116/1.578490 |