EP0653409 - Preparation of tertiary butyl alcohol by catalytic decomposition of tertiary butyl hydroperoxide [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.12.1999 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.12.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.02.2000 [2000/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huntsman Specialty Chemicals Corporation 7114 North Lamar Boulevard Austin, Texas 78761 / US | [1997/35] |
Former [1995/20] | For all designated states TEXACO DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION 2000 Westchester Avenue White Plains, New York 10650 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sanderson, John Ronald 15290 Faubion Trail Leander, Texas 78641 / US | 02 /
Mueller, Mark Allan 13103 Mansfield Circle Austin, Texas 78723 / US | 03 /
Sheu, Yu-Hwa Edward 321 Kuang Fu Road, Sec 2 Hsinchu, Taiwan 300 ROC / TW | [1995/20] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J., et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/31] | Goddar, Heinz J., Dr., et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 80801 München / DE | ||
Former [1995/20] | Green, Mark Charles, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord, 91 Wimpole Street London W1M 8AH / GB | Application number, filing date | 94308301.4 | 10.11.1994 | [1995/20] | Priority number, date | US19930150916 | 12.11.1993 Original published format: US 150916 | [1995/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0653409 | Date: | 17.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0653409 | Date: | 17.02.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.03.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C07C29/132, C07C29/50, C07C409/04 | [1995/20] | CPC: |
C07C29/132 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C29/132, C07C31/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1995/20] | Title | German: | Herstellung von tertiären Butylalkohol durch katalytische Zersetzung von tertiären Butylhydroperoid | [1995/20] | English: | Preparation of tertiary butyl alcohol by catalytic decomposition of tertiary butyl hydroperoxide | [1995/20] | French: | Fabrication de l'alcool tert.-butylique par décomposition catalytique de l'hydropéroxyde tert.-butylique | [1995/20] | Examination procedure | 26.10.1995 | Examination requested [1995/52] | 20.11.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.01.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.12.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.04.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.07.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.10.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 12.10.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.11.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3248465 (BAYER AG [DE]) [X] 1-5 * page 4, line 22 - page 5, line 3 * * page 7, line 7 - line 13 * * page 8, line 5 - page 9, line 18 *; | [DX]US4551553 (TAYLOR PAUL D [US], et al) [DX] 1,4,5 * column 7, line 1 - line 20 *; | [X]EP0336480 (METALLGESELLSCHAFT AG [DE]) [X] 1,4,5 * page 2, line 31 - line 54 * * example 1 * * claim 1 *; | [A]US5025113 (SANDERSON JOHN R [US], et al) [A] 1-5* whole document, esp. col. 5 * |