EP0654520 - Integrated catalytic cracking and olefin producing process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.06.2000 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.06.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.07.2000 [2000/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Exxon Research and Engineering Company, (a Delaware corp.) PO Box 390 Florham Park, New Jersey 07932 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/21] | For all designated states Exxon Research and Engineering Company, (a Delaware corp.) PO Box 390 Florham Park, New Jersey 07932 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kerby, Michael Charld 10731 McShay Avenue Baton Rouge, Louisiana 70810 / US | 02 /
Bearden, Roby, Jr. 505 Stanford Avenue Baton Rouge, Louisiana 70808 / US | 03 /
Davis, Stephen Mark 15739 Chickamauga Drive Baton Rouge, Louisiana 70817 / US | [1995/21] | Representative(s) | Somers, Harold Arnold, et al ESSO Engineering (Europe) Ltd. Patents & Licences Mailpoint 12 Esso House, Ermyn Way Leatherhead, Surrey KT22 8XE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/21] | Somers, Harold Arnold, et al ESSO Engineering (Europe) Ltd. Patents & Licences Mailpoint 72 Esso House Ermyn Way Leatherhead, Surrey KT22 8XE / GB | Application number, filing date | 94308423.6 | 15.11.1994 | [1995/21] | Priority number, date | US19930154829 | 19.11.1993 Original published format: US 154829 | [1995/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0654520 | Date: | 24.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0654520 | Date: | 04.08.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C10G11/18, C10G57/00 | [1995/21] | CPC: |
C10G11/18 (EP);
C10G2400/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1995/21] | Title | German: | Integriertes katalytisches Krack- und Olefinen Herstellungsverfahren | [1995/21] | English: | Integrated catalytic cracking and olefin producing process | [1995/21] | French: | Procédé intégré de craquage catalytique et de production d'oléfines | [1995/21] | Examination procedure | 26.10.1995 | Examination requested [1995/52] | 27.05.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.12.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.08.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.02.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.04.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 12.04.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.05.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0325437 (EXXON) [A] 1-6 * figures 1,2; claims 1-14 *; | [DA]EP0259156 (MOBIL OIL) [DA] 1 * figure 5 *; | [A]US3894935 (MOBIL OIL) [A] 1 * figures 1,2; claims 1-6 *; | [A]US4968401 (MOBIL OIL); | [A]EP0168185 (EXXON); | [PA]EP0577280 (EXXON) |