EP0654587 - Turbine with variable inlet geometry [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.11.1999 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.02.2008 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: DE | published on 26.03.2008 [2008/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOLSET ENGINEERING COMPANY LIMITED St. Andrews Road Huddersfield, HD1 6RA / GB | [1995/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Parker, John Frederick c/o Holset Engineering Co. Ltd., St. Andrews Road Huddersfield HD1 6RA / GB | 02 /
Garrett, Stephen Edward c/o Holset Engineering Co. Ltd., St. Andrews Road Huddersfield HD1 6RA / GB | [1995/21] | Representative(s) | Allman, Peter John, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Sussex House 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester M2 3LG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/21] | Allman, Peter John, et al MARKS & CLERK, Sussex House, 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester M2 3LG / GB | Application number, filing date | 94308486.3 | 16.11.1994 | [1995/21] | Priority number, date | GB19930023840 | 19.11.1993 Original published format: GB 9323840 | [1995/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0654587 | Date: | 24.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0654587 | Date: | 20.01.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.02.1995 | Classification | IPC: | F01D17/14, F02B37/12 | [1995/21] | CPC: |
F02B37/22 (EP,US);
F01D17/143 (EP,US);
F05D2220/40 (EP,US);
Y02T10/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1995/21] | Extension states | LT | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Turbine mit variabler Einlassgeometrie | [1995/21] | English: | Turbine with variable inlet geometry | [1995/21] | French: | Turbine avec entrée à géométrie variable | [1995/21] | Examination procedure | 10.11.1995 | Examination requested [1996/02] | 24.06.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.02.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 21.03.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.02.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.05.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.06.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 19.06.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.10.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/02] | Request for further processing for: | 21.03.1997 | Request for further processing filed | 24.03.1997 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.04.1997 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 20.01.1999 | [2008/13] |
Former [2008/05] | IT | 20.01.1999 | |
DE | 21.04.1999 | ||
Former [2000/12] | DE | 21.04.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | [YX]GB1106107 (SULZER AG) [Y] 1-8 * page 2, line 5 - line 24; figure . * [X] 1-4; | [X]US3426964 (SILVERN DAVID H) [X] 1-4 * column 3, line 6 - line 27; figure 2 *; | [X]DE1913048 (DRESSER IND) [X] 1-4 * page 6, paragraph 1; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0093462 (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE [CH]) [A] 1 * page 6, line 17 - line 20; figure 2 *; | [A]EP0131406 (HOLSET ENGINEERING CO [GB]) [A] 1* page 13, line 10 - line 18; figure 3 *; | [YD]US5044880 (MCKEAN PETER [GB]) [YD] 1-8 * the whole document * | Examination | US4403914 |