EP0656645 - Field effect transistor with a sealed diffusion junction [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.07.2002 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AT&T Corp. 32 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10013-2412 / US | [1995/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lee, Kuo-Hua 1308 Country Club Road Wescosville, Pennsylvania 18106 / US | 02 /
Liu, Chun-Ting 1475 Bogie Avenue Wescosville, Pennsylvania 18106 / US | 03 /
Liu, Ruichen 4 Northridge Way Warren, New Jersey 07060 / US | [1995/23] | Representative(s) | Williams, David John, et al Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/19] | Williams, David John, et al Page White & Farrer, 54 Doughty Street London WC1N 2LS / GB | ||
Former [1995/23] | Watts, Christopher Malcolm Kelway, Dr., et al AT&T (UK) Ltd. 5, Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex, IG8 0TU / GB | Application number, filing date | 94308646.2 | 23.11.1994 | [1995/23] | Priority number, date | US19930160600 | 01.12.1993 Original published format: US 160600 | [1995/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0656645 | Date: | 07.06.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0656645 | Date: | 31.07.1996 | [1996/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0656645 | Date: | 19.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.06.1996 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/225, H01L21/336, H01L21/8238, H01L23/532 | [1995/23] | CPC: |
H01L29/0847 (EP,US);
H01L21/2257 (EP,US);
H01L29/456 (EP,US);
H01L29/66575 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1995/23] | Title | German: | Feldeffekttransistor mit einem versiegelten diffundierten Übergang | [2000/40] | English: | Field effect transistor with a sealed diffusion junction | [1995/23] | French: | Transistor à effet de champ à jonction diffusée scellée | [1995/23] |
Former [1995/23] | Feldeffekttransistor mit einem diffusionierten versiegelten Übergang | Examination procedure | 16.01.1997 | Examination requested [1997/12] | 27.10.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.03.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.03.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.06.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 28.06.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.06.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 19.09.2001 | ES | 26.03.2002 | [2008/05] |
Former [2004/04] | ES | 26.03.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0399141 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [A] 1,8,9 * abstract *; | [DA]EP0319215 (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]) [DA] 1,8,9; | [A]US5206187 (DOAN TRUNG T [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 5, line 42 - column 7, line 4; figures 5-8,13 * | [A] - NIAZMAND M ET AL, "SHALLOW JUNCTION FORMATION BY DOPANT OUTDIFFUSION FROM COSI2 AND ITS APPLICATION IN SUB 0.5UM MOS PROCESSES", MICROELECTRONIC ENGINEERING, (19930401), vol. 21, no. 1 / 04, pages 427 - 430, XP000361119 [A] 1,4-6,7 * page 428 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0167-9317(93)90105-E | [A] - CHIH-YUAN LU ET AL, "A FOLDED EXTENDED WINDOW MOSFET FOR ULSI APPLICATIONS", IEEE ELECTRON DEVICE LETTERS, NEW YORK, NY, US, (198808), vol. 9, no. 8, pages 388 - 390, XP000001536 [A] 1,4-7 * page 388; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/55.753 |