EP0657689 - Staged air, low NOx burner with internal recuperative flue gas recirculation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.09.1998 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 29.07.2009 [2009/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GAS RESEARCH INSTITUTE 8600 West Bryn Mawr Avenue Chicago Illinois 60631-3562 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/24] | For all designated states GAS RESEARCH INSTITUTE 8600 West Bryn Mawr Avenue Chicago Illinois 60631-3562 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Moreland, Donald P. 1067 Hillview Lane Hershey Pennysylvania 17033 / US | [1995/24] | Representative(s) | Jones, William Willow Lane House Willow Lane Norwich Norfolk NR2 1EU / GB | [2009/31] |
Former [1995/24] | Jones, William Willow Lane House Willow Lane Norwich Norfolk, NR2 1EU / GB | Application number, filing date | 94308752.8 | 28.11.1994 | [1995/24] | Priority number, date | US19930166449 | 13.12.1993 Original published format: US 166449 | [1995/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0657689 | Date: | 14.06.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0657689 | Date: | 05.11.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.1995 | Classification | IPC: | F23C6/04, F23C9/00, F23C7/06 | [1995/24] | CPC: |
G01R33/56 (EP,US);
F23C6/045 (EP,US);
F23C7/06 (EP,US);
F23C9/00 (EP,US);
G01R33/58 (EP,US);
F23C2201/20 (EP,US);
F23C2202/10 (EP,US);
F23C2900/06041 (EP,US);
F23C2900/09002 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1995/24] | Title | German: | Brenner mit niedrigem NOx-Gehalt, mit abgestufter Luftzufuhr mit interner rekuperativer Rauchgasrückführung | [1995/24] | English: | Staged air, low NOx burner with internal recuperative flue gas recirculation | [1995/24] | French: | Brûleur à faible taux de nox, à alimentation en air étagée avec recyclage interne récupérateur des fumées | [1995/24] | Examination procedure | 06.12.1995 | Examination requested [1996/05] | 22.01.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.05.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.07.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 16.07.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.08.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.11.1997 | BE | 05.11.1997 | CH | 05.11.1997 | DK | 05.11.1997 | ES | 05.11.1997 | FR | 05.11.1997 | IT | 05.11.1997 | LI | 05.11.1997 | NL | 05.11.1997 | LU | 28.11.1997 | SE | 05.02.1998 | DE | 06.02.1998 | [2004/38] |
Former [2004/35] | AT | 05.11.1997 | |
BE | 05.11.1997 | ||
CH | 05.11.1997 | ||
DK | 05.11.1997 | ||
ES | 05.11.1997 | ||
FR | 05.11.1997 | ||
IT | 05.11.1997 | ||
LI | 05.11.1997 | ||
NL | 05.11.1997 | ||
LU | 30.11.1997 | ||
SE | 05.02.1998 | ||
DE | 06.02.1998 | ||
Former [2003/08] | AT | 05.11.1997 | |
BE | 05.11.1997 | ||
CH | 05.11.1997 | ||
DK | 05.11.1997 | ||
ES | 05.11.1997 | ||
IT | 05.11.1997 | ||
LI | 05.11.1997 | ||
NL | 05.11.1997 | ||
LU | 30.11.1997 | ||
SE | 05.02.1998 | ||
DE | 06.02.1998 | ||
FR | 03.04.1998 | ||
Former [2002/26] | AT | 05.11.1997 | |
BE | 05.11.1997 | ||
CH | 05.11.1997 | ||
DK | 05.11.1997 | ||
ES | 05.11.1997 | ||
IT | 05.11.1997 | ||
LI | 05.11.1997 | ||
LU | 30.11.1997 | ||
SE | 05.02.1998 | ||
DE | 06.02.1998 | ||
FR | 03.04.1998 | ||
Former [2000/52] | AT | 05.11.1997 | |
BE | 05.11.1997 | ||
CH | 05.11.1997 | ||
DK | 05.11.1997 | ||
IT | 05.11.1997 | ||
LI | 05.11.1997 | ||
LU | 30.11.1997 | ||
SE | 05.02.1998 | ||
DE | 06.02.1998 | ||
FR | 03.04.1998 | ||
Former [2000/50] | AT | 05.11.1997 | |
BE | 05.11.1997 | ||
DK | 05.11.1997 | ||
IT | 05.11.1997 | ||
LU | 30.11.1997 | ||
SE | 05.02.1998 | ||
DE | 06.02.1998 | ||
CH | 10.02.1998 | ||
LI | 10.02.1998 | ||
FR | 03.04.1998 | ||
Former [2000/07] | AT | 05.11.1997 | |
BE | 05.11.1997 | ||
DK | 05.11.1997 | ||
IT | 05.11.1997 | ||
LU | 30.11.1997 | ||
SE | 05.02.1998 | ||
DE | 06.02.1998 | ||
FR | 03.04.1998 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 05.11.1997 | |
BE | 05.11.1997 | ||
DK | 05.11.1997 | ||
IT | 05.11.1997 | ||
SE | 05.02.1998 | ||
DE | 06.02.1998 | ||
FR | 03.04.1998 | ||
Former [1998/46] | AT | 05.11.1997 | |
BE | 05.11.1997 | ||
DK | 05.11.1997 | ||
SE | 05.02.1998 | ||
DE | 06.02.1998 | ||
FR | 03.04.1998 | ||
Former [1998/44] | AT | 05.11.1997 | |
DK | 05.11.1997 | ||
SE | 05.02.1998 | ||
DE | 06.02.1998 | ||
FR | 03.04.1998 | ||
Former [1998/35] | AT | 05.11.1997 | |
DK | 05.11.1997 | ||
SE | 05.02.1998 | ||
DE | 06.02.1998 | ||
Former [1998/30] | AT | 05.11.1997 | |
DK | 05.11.1997 | ||
DE | 06.02.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4060379 (LAHAYE PAUL G, et al) [A] 1,2,5 * column 4, line 61 - column 5, line 20 * * column 5, line 62 - column 6, line 39 * * column 6, line 51 - column 7, line 14 * * figure 9 *; | [A]GB1581300 (FLYNN BURNER CORP); | [A]GB2126331 (STORDY COMBUSTION ENG); | [AP]WO9409315 (GAS RES INST INC [US], et al) [AP] 1-4,9,10 * figure 1; claims 1,2,6,13,14 * |