EP0656555 - Display for 3D images [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.01.2004 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu 545-0013 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/12] | For all designated states SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22 Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu 545-0013 / JP | ||
Former [1999/09] | For all designated states SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22 Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu 545 / JP | ||
Former [1995/23] | For all designated states SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 545 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Woodgate, Graham John 77 Greys Road Henley-on-Thames, Oxfordshire RG9 1TD / GB | 02 /
Ezra, David 19 Monk's Mead, Brightwell-cum-Sotwell Wallingford, Oxon OX10 0RL / GB | 03 /
Omar, Basil Arthur, The Old Forge 2 Frogmore Lane, Stanford in the Vale Faringdon, Oxon, SN7 8LG / GB | [1995/23] | Representative(s) | Robinson, John Stuart Marks & Clerk LLP 4220 Nash Court Oxford Business Park South Oxford OX4 2RU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Robinson, John Stuart Marks & Clerk, 4220 Nash Court, Oxford Business Park South Oxford OX4 2RU / GB | ||
Former [2003/12] | Robinson, John Stuart Marks & Clerk Nash Court Oxford Business Park South Oxford OX4 2RU / GB | ||
Former [1995/23] | White, Martin David MARKS & CLERK, Alpha Tower, Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | Application number, filing date | 94308874.0 | 30.11.1994 | [1995/23] | Priority number, date | GB19930024703 | 01.12.1993 Original published format: GB 9324703 | GB19940021278 | 21.10.1994 Original published format: GB 9421278 | [1995/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0656555 | Date: | 07.06.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0656555 | Date: | 19.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G02B27/22 | [1995/23] | CPC: |
G02B27/0093 (EP,US);
G02B30/24 (EP,US);
G02B30/27 (US);
G02B30/33 (EP,US);
G02B30/35 (EP,US);
H04N13/305 (EP,US);
H04N13/31 (EP,US);
H04N13/32 (EP,US);
H04N13/346 (EP,US);
H04N13/354 (EP,US);
H04N13/368 (EP,US);
H04N13/371 (EP,US);
H04N13/373 (EP,US);
H04N13/376 (EP,US);
H04N13/378 (EP,US);
H04N13/38 (EP,US);
H04N13/398 (EP,US);
H04N13/117 (EP,US);
H04N13/15 (EP,US);
H04N13/156 (EP,US);
H04N13/161 (EP,US);
H04N13/189 (EP,US);
H04N13/221 (EP,US);
H04N13/243 (EP,US);
H04N13/257 (EP,US);
H04N13/286 (EP,US);
H04N13/289 (EP,US);
H04N13/296 (EP,US);
H04N13/307 (EP,US);
H04N13/324 (EP,US);
H04N13/337 (EP,US);
H04N13/341 (EP,US);
H04N13/349 (EP,US);
H04N13/363 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1995/23] | Title | German: | Display für dreidimensionale Bilder | [1995/23] | English: | Display for 3D images | [1995/23] | French: | Système de visualisation d'images 3-dimensionelles | [1995/23] | Examination procedure | 22.11.1995 | Examination requested [1996/03] | 15.04.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.10.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.11.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.12.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.04.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.06.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 21.06.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP02003729.7 Application deemed to be withdrawn : 20.03.2002 | EP02100151.6 / EP1209508 | Opposition(s) | 22.12.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/11] | Request for further processing for: | 23.09.2002 | Request for further processing filed | 06.09.2002 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.09.2002 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0262955 (BASS MARTIN LAWRENCE [GB], et al) [A] 1-4 * column 6, lines 32-55; figure - *; | [Y]EP0354851 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE [JP]) [Y] 1,2 * abstract *; | [Y]WO9319394 (DELTA SYSTEM DESIGN LTD [GB]) [Y] 1,2 * abstract *; | [PX]EP0576106 (DIMENSION TECH INC [US]) [PX] 1,2 * figure 6; claim 23 *; | [PX]DE4309667 (UNIV DRESDEN TECH [DE]) [PX] 1,2* abstract * | Examination | US2883906 | US4649425 | US5132839 |