EP0656561 - Silver halide color photographic light-sensitive material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.01.1999 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KONICA CORPORATION 26-2, Nishishinjuku 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/23] | For all designated states KONICA CORPORATION 26-2, Nishi-shinjuku 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kita, Hiroshi c/o Konica corporation, of 1 sakura-machi Hino-shi, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Ishidai, Hiroshi c/o Konica corporation, of 1 sakura-machi Hino-shi, Tokyo / JP | [1995/23] | Representative(s) | Ellis-Jones, Patrick George Armine J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/23] | Ellis-Jones, Patrick George Armine J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 94308878.1 | 30.11.1994 | [1995/23] | Priority number, date | JP19930301944 | 01.12.1993 Original published format: JP 30194493 | [1995/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0656561 | Date: | 07.06.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0656561 | Date: | 02.08.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0656561 | Date: | 25.03.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.06.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G03C7/38, G03C7/305 | [1995/23] | CPC: |
C07D487/04 (EP,US);
G03C7/3835 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1995/23] | Title | German: | Photographisches lichtempfindliches Silberhalogenidfarbmaterial | [1995/23] | English: | Silver halide color photographic light-sensitive material | [1995/23] | French: | Matériau photographique couleur à l'halogénure d'argent sensible à la lumière | [1995/23] | Examination procedure | 02.05.1995 | Examination requested [1995/26] | 19.07.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.01.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.05.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.09.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.12.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 15.12.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.12.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 25.03.1998 | DE | 26.06.1998 | [2006/14] |
Former [1999/01] | DE | 26.06.1998 | |
FR | 21.08.1998 | ||
Former [1998/52] | FR | 21.08.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH05241283 ; | [X]JPH05241292 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19931222), vol. 17, no. 703, Database accession no. (P - 1666), & JP5241283 A 19930921 (KONICA CORPORATION) [X] 1-10 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19931222), vol. 17, no. 703, Database accession no. (P - 1666), & JP5241292 A 19930921 (KONICA CORPORATION) [X] 1-10 * abstract * |