EP0662735 - Method and apparatus for forming leakproof feed-through connector and for installing and holding sealing components in place [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.04.1999 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.04.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.06.1999 [1999/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Borg-Warner Automotive, Inc. 6700 18 1/2 Mile Road P.O. Box 8022 Sterling Heights MI 48311-8022 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/28] | For all designated states BORG-WARNER AUTOMOTIVE, INC. 6700 18 1/2 Mile Road, P.O. Box 8022 Sterling Heights, Michigan 48311-8022 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Moyers, Chester 54 Carriage Hill Road Sterling, Illinois 61081 / US | 02 /
Lenz, Robert L. 23 Palmyra Road Sterling, Illinois 61081 / US | [1995/28] | Representative(s) | Allden, Thomas Stanley, et al A.A. Thornton & CO. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/28] | Allden, Thomas Stanley, et al A.A. THORNTON & CO. Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 94308928.4 | 01.12.1994 | [1995/28] | Priority number, date | US19940178711 | 10.01.1994 Original published format: US 178711 | US19940224964 | 08.04.1994 Original published format: US 224964 | [1995/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0662735 | Date: | 12.07.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0662735 | Date: | 04.03.1998 | [1998/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.01.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/52 | [1995/28] | CPC: |
H01R13/5208 (EP,US);
H02G3/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1995/28] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Herstellung eines dichten Durchführverbinders und zum Anordnen und Befestigen von Dichtungen | [1995/28] | English: | Method and apparatus for forming leakproof feed-through connector and for installing and holding sealing components in place | [1995/28] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour former des connecteurs de traversée étanches contre les fuites et pour installer et fixer des matériaux d'étanchéité | [1995/28] | Examination procedure | 05.09.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/23] | 14.01.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1999/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 19.10.1998 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1998 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3922477 (GLOWACZ ANTHONY A) [A] 1-4; | [A]US4355855 (REBIKOFF DIMITRI)[A] 1,5,7 |