EP0656632 - Fuel assembly with fuel rod supporting members [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.1998 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.08.1998 [1998/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI NUCLEAR FUEL CO. 6-1, Otemachi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | For all designated states MITSUBISHI JUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/36] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI NUCLEAR FUEL CO. 6-1, Otemachi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | ||
For all designated states MITSUBISHI JUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | |||
Former [1995/23] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI NUCLEAR FUEL CO. 6-1, Otemachi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | ||
For all designated states MITSUBISHI JUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | |||
For all designated states MITSUBISHI ATOMIC POWER INDUSTRIES, INC 3-1, Minatomirai 3-chome, Nishi-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Oyama, Junichi, c/o Mitzubishi Nuclear Fuel Co. Tohkai-Mura Naka-gun, Ibaraki-ken / JP | 02 /
Kato, Akihiro, c/o Mitsubishi Nuclear Fuel Co. Tohkai-Mura Naka-gun, Ibaraki-ken / JP | 03 /
Inada, Hitoshi, c/o Mitsubishi Nuclear Fuel Co. Tohkai-Mura Naka-gun, Ibaraki-ken / JP | 04 /
Kawagoe, Toshiyuki, c/o Mitshubishi Atomic Power Industries,Inc. 3-1, Minatomirai 3-chome, Nishi-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanawaga-ken / JP | 05 /
Mori, Masaji, c/o Mitsubishi Jukogyo Kabushiki Kaisha, Hyogo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | 06 /
Suzuki, Kazuichi, c/o Mitsubishi Jukogyo Kabushiki Kaisha Hyogo-ku, Kobe-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | 07 /
Miyai, Hiromasa, c/o Mitsubishi Jukogyo Kabushiki Kaisha Hyogo-ku, Kobe-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | [1998/23] |
Former [1996/12] | 01 /
Oyama, Junichi, c/o Tohkai Seisakusho Mitsubishi Nuclear Fuel Co., 622-1, Funaishikawa Tohkai-Mura, Naka-gun, Ibaraki-ken / JP | ||
02 /
Kato, Akihiro, c/o Tohkai Seisakusho Mitsubishi Nuclear Fuel Co., 622-1, Funaishikawa Tohkai-Mura, Naka-gun, Ibaraki-ken / JP | |||
03 /
Inada, Hitoshi, c/o Tohkai Seisakusho Mitsubishi Nuclear Fuel Co., 622-1, Funaishikawa Tohkai-Mura, Naka-gun, Ibaraki-ken / JP | |||
04 /
Kawagoe, Toshiyuki, c/o Mitshubishi Atomic Power Industries,Inc. 3-1, Minatomirai 3-chome, Nishi-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanawaga-ken / JP | |||
05 /
Mori, Masaji, Kobe Shipyard & Machinery Works Mitsubishi Jukogyo K.K., 1-1 Wadasaki-cho 1-chome Hyogo-ku, Kobe-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | |||
06 /
Suzuki, Kazuichi, Kobe Shipyard & Machinery Works Mitsubishi Jukogyo K.K., 1-1 Wadasaki-cho 1-chome Hyogo-ku, Kobe-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | |||
07 /
Miyai, Hiromasa, Kobe Shipyard & Machinery Works Mitsubishi Jukogyo K. K., 1-1 Wadasaki-cho 1-chome Hyogo-ku, Kobe-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | |||
Former [1995/40] | 01 /
Oyama, Junichi, c/o Tohkai Seisakusho Mitsubishi Nuclear Fuel Co., 622-1, Funaishikawa Tohkai-Mura, Naka-gun, Ibaraki-ken / JP | ||
02 /
Kato, Akihiro, c/o Tohkai Seisakusho Mitsubishi Nuclear Fuel Co., 622-1, Funaishikawa Tohkai-Mura, Naka-gun, Ibaraki-ken / JP | |||
03 /
Inada, Hitoshi, c/o Tohkai Seisakusho Mitsubishi Nuclear Fuel Co., 622-1, Funaishikawa Tohkai-Mura, Naka-gun, Ibaraki-ken / JP | |||
04 /
Kawagoe, Toshiyuki, c/o Mitshubishi Atomic Power Ind, 3-1, Minatomirai 3-chome, Nishi-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanawaga-ken / JP | |||
05 /
Mori, Masaji, Kobe Shipyard & Machinery Works Mitshubishi Jukogyo K.K., 1-1 Wadasaki-cho 1-chome Hyogo-ku, Kobe-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | |||
06 /
Suzuki, Kazuichi Kobe Shipyard & Machinery Works Mitshubishi Jukogyo K.K., 1-1 Wadasaki-cho 1-chome Hyogo-ku, Kobe-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | |||
07 /
Miyai, Hiromasa, Kobe Shipyard & Machinery Works Mitsubishi Jukogyo K. K., 1-1 Wadasaki-cho 1-chome Hyogo-ku, Kobe-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | |||
Former [1995/39] | 01 /
Oyama, Junichi, c/o Tohkai Seisakusho Mitsubishi Nuclear Fuel Co., 622-1, Funaishikawa Tohkai-Mura, Naka-gun, Ibaraki-ken / JP | ||
02 /
Kato, Akihiro, c/o Tohkai Seisakusho Mitsubishi Nuclear Fuel Co., 622-1, Funaishikawa Tohkai-Mura, Naka-gun, Ibaraki-ken / JP | |||
03 /
Inada, Hitoshi, c/o Tohkai Seisakusho Mitsubishi Nuclear Fuel Co., 622-1, Funaishikawa Tohkai-Mura, Naka-gun, Ibaraki-ken / JP | |||
04 /
Kawagoe, Toshiyuki, c/o Mitshubishi Atomic Power Ind, 3-1, Minatomirai 3-chome, Nishi-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanawaga-ken / JP | |||
05 /
Mori, Masaji, c/o Kobe Shipyard & Machinery Works Mitshubishi Jukogyo K.K., 1-1 Wadasaki-cho 1-chome Hyogo-ku, Kobe-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | |||
06 /
Suzuki, Kazuichi c/o Kobe Shipyard & Mach.Works Mitshubishi Jukogyo K.K., 1-1 Wadasaki-cho 1-chome Hyogo-ku, Kobe-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | |||
07 /
Miyai, Hiromasa, c/o Kobe Shipyard & Mach.Works Mitsubishi Jukogyo K. K., 1-1 Wadasaki-cho 1-chome Hyogo-ku, Kobe-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | |||
Former [1995/23] | 01 /
Oyama, Junichi, c/o Tohkai Seisakusho Mitsubishi Nuclear Fuel Co., 622-1, Funaishikawa Tohkai-Mura, Naka-gun, Ibaraki-ken / JP | ||
02 /
Kato, Akihiro, c/o Tohkai Seisakusho Mitsubishi Nuclear Fuel Co., 622-1, Funaishikawa Tohkai-Mura, Naka-gun, Ibaraki-ken / JP | |||
03 /
Inada, Hitoshi, c/o Tohkai Seisakusho Mitsubishi Nuclear Fuel Co., 622-1, Funaishikawa Tohkai-Mura, Naka-gun, Ibaraki-ken / JP | |||
04 /
Kawagoe, Toshiyuki, c/o Mitshubishi Atomic Power Ind, 3-1, Minatomirai 3-chome, Nishi-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanawaga-ken / JP | |||
05 /
Mori, Masaji, c/o Kobe Shipyard & Mach. Works Mitshubishi Jukogyo K.K., 1-1 Wadasaki-cho 1-chome Hyogo-ku, Kobe-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | |||
06 /
Suzuki, Kazuichi c/o Kobe Shipyard & Mach. Works Mitshubishi Jukogyo K.K., 1-1 Wadasaki-cho 1-chome Hyogo-ku, Kobe-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | |||
07 /
Miyai, Hiromasa, c/o Kobe Shipyard & Mach. Works Mitsubishi Jukogyo K. K., 1-1 Wadasaki-cho 1-chome Hyogo-ku, Kobe-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | Representative(s) | Dealtry, Brian Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/23] | Dealtry, Brian Eric Potter & Clarkson St. Mary's Court St. Mary's Gate Nottingham NG1 1LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 94308942.5 | 01.12.1994 | [1995/23] | Priority number, date | JP19930304462 | 03.12.1993 Original published format: JP 30446293 | [1995/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0656632 | Date: | 07.06.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/23] | Type: | A1 / A2 RE Reissue of A-publication | No.: | EP0656632 | Date: | 28.09.1995 | [1995/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0656632 | Date: | 03.09.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G21C3/356, G21C3/352 | [1995/23] | CPC: |
G21C3/352 (EP,US);
G21C3/356 (EP,US);
Y02E30/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB [1995/23] | Title | German: | Brennstabbündel mit Brennstabhaltegliedern | [1995/23] | English: | Fuel assembly with fuel rod supporting members | [1995/23] | French: | Assemblage combustible avec dispositifs de support des barreaux de combustible | [1995/23] | Examination procedure | 06.10.1995 | Examination requested [1995/49] | 18.04.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.08.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.03.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.05.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 29.05.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.06.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2352373 (EXXON NUCLEAR CO INC [US]) [A] 1* figures 1A-7B; claim 1 *; | [A]US4885127 (YOKOYAMA BUNGO [JP]) [A] 1 * figures 1-6; claims 1,7,12,18 * | Examination | US4521374 |