EP0657457 - Fluorinated diazabicycloalkane derivatives [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1995/24] | Novel fluorinated diazabicycloalkane derivatives | ||
[1999/06] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.05.2001 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.05.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.06.2001 [2001/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AIR PRODUCTS AND CHEMICALS, INC. 7201 Hamilton Boulevard Allentown, PA 18195-1501 / US | [1995/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Banks, Ronald Eric 9 Lingfield Avenue Hazel Grove Stockport Cheshire SK7 4SL / GB | [1998/36] |
Former [1995/24] | 01 /
Banks, Ronald Eric 9 Lingfield Avenue Hazel Grove Stockport Cheshire SK7 4SL / US | Representative(s) | Burford, Anthony Frederick Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/24] | Burford, Anthony Frederick W.H. Beck, Greener & Co. 7 Stone Buildings Lincoln's Inn London WC2A 3SZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 94308967.2 | 02.12.1994 | [1995/24] | Priority number, date | US19930163257 | 07.12.1993 Original published format: US 163257 | [1995/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0657457 | Date: | 14.06.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0657457 | Date: | 05.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.03.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C07D487/08, // (C07D487/08, 241:00, 241:00) | [1995/24] | CPC: |
C07D487/08 (EP,US);
C07B39/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1995/24] | Title | German: | Fluorierte Diazabicycloalkanderivate | [1995/24] | English: | Fluorinated diazabicycloalkane derivatives | [1999/06] | French: | Dérivés fluorés diazabicycloalkanes | [1999/08] |
Former [1995/24] | Novel fluorinated diazabicycloalkane derivatives | ||
Former [1995/24] | Dérivés fluorurés de diazabicycloalkanes | Examination procedure | 14.06.1995 | Examination requested [1995/32] | 11.12.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.02.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.07.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.09.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.06.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.09.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 22.09.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.04.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0478210 (AIR PROD & CHEM [US]) [A] 1 * claims 1,11 *; | [D]US5086178 (BANKS RONALD E [GB]) | Examination | US5473065 | - BANKS R.E. AND BESHEESH M.K., JOURNAL OF FLUORINE CHEMISTRY, (1995), vol. 74, pages 165 - 166 |