EP0657623 - Anti-contamination thrust balancing system for gas turbine engines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.01.2000 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.01.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.03.2000 [2000/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/12] | For all designated states UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION United Technologies Building, 1 Financial Plaza Hartford, CT 06101 / US | ||
Former [1995/24] | For all designated states UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION United Technologies Building 1, Financial Plaza Hartford, CT 06101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mize, Christopher D 106 1st Court Palm Beach Gardens, Florida 33410 / US | 02 /
Pirsig, William W. 51 Briarwood Drive Manchester, Connecticut 06040 / US | 03 /
Vercellone, Peter T. 53 Hansen Farm Road North Haven, Connecticut 06473 / US | [1995/24] | Representative(s) | Leckey, David Herbert Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/24] | Leckey, David Herbert Frank B. Dehn & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 94309045.6 | 06.12.1994 | [1995/24] | Priority number, date | US19930163098 | 06.12.1993 Original published format: US 163098 | [1995/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0657623 | Date: | 14.06.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0657623 | Date: | 24.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.03.1995 | Classification | IPC: | F01D5/08 | [1995/24] | CPC: |
F01D5/081 (EP,US);
F01D3/00 (EP,US);
F05D2260/607 (EP,US);
Y02T50/60 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1995/24] | Title | German: | Kontaminationsfreies Schubausgleichsystem für Gasturbine | [1995/24] | English: | Anti-contamination thrust balancing system for gas turbine engines | [1995/24] | French: | Système d'équilibrage de la poussée évitant contamination pour turbine à gaz | [1995/24] | Examination procedure | 07.12.1995 | Examination requested [1996/05] | 28.04.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.12.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 20.02.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.06.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.09.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 11.09.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.12.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/11] | Request for further processing for: | 20.02.1998 | Request for further processing filed | 20.02.1998 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.03.1998 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3356340 (MELVIN BOBO); | [AD]US3989410 (FERRARI BARTOLOMEO JOSEPH) [AD] 1 * column 2, line 54 - column 3, line 4; figure . *; | [A]GB2184167 (GEN ELECTRIC) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * page 1, line 70 - line 76 * * page 1, lines 101-111 * * page 3, lines 55-121; figure 4 *; | [AD]US4730978 (BARAN JR WALTER J [US]) [AD] 1 * column 2, line 33 - line 47 * * column 4, line 42 - line 53; figure 6 *; | [A]US4798047 (GEARY CARL H [US])[A] 1; | [AD]US4822244 (MAIER MARK S [US], et al) [AD] 1; | [A]US5222693 (SLUTZKIN SAMUEL [IL], et al) [A] 1 |