EP0657819 - Cache memory [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 31.08.2001 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 03.09.2008 [2008/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES, INC. One AMD Place Mail Stop 68 P.O. Box 3453 Sunnyvale CA 94088-3453 / US | [2008/36] |
Former [1995/24] | For all designated states ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES INC. One AMD Place, P.O. Box 3453 Sunnyvale, California 94088-3453 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Witt, David B. 6318 Pathfinder Drive Austin, Texas 78759 / US | [1995/24] | Representative(s) | Wright, Hugh Ronald, et al Brookes Batchellor LLP 1 Boyne Park Tunbridge Wells Kent TN4 8EL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/24] | Wright, Hugh Ronald, et al Brookes & Martin 52/54 High Holborn London WC1V 6SE / GB | Application number, filing date | 94309200.7 | 09.12.1994 | [1995/24] | Priority number, date | US19930164246 | 09.12.1993 Original published format: US 164246 | [1995/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0657819 | Date: | 14.06.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0657819 | Date: | 07.08.1996 | [1996/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.06.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G06F12/08 | [1995/24] | CPC: |
G06F12/0897 (EP,US);
G06F12/0804 (EP,US);
Y02D10/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LU, NL, PT, SE [1995/24] | Title | German: | Cachespeicher | [1995/24] | English: | Cache memory | [1995/24] | French: | Antémémoire | [1995/24] | Examination procedure | 14.11.1996 | Examination requested [1997/02] | 20.05.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.11.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.01.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.03.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2001/42] | 22.09.2000 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2001/42] | Appeal following examination | 21.07.2000 | Appeal received No. T0200/01 | 22.09.2000 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]GB2215887 (INT COMPUTERS LTD [GB]) [X] 1-3,7,8,10-12,16 * page 2, line 4 - page 5, line 18 * [Y] 9,17,18; | [Y]US5029126 (YAMAGUCHI SEIJI [JP]) [Y] 9,17,18 * column 1, line 64 - column 3, line 35; figure 1 *; | [X]DE2154106 (RCA CORP.) [X] 1-3,6,7,10-12,15,16,19,21 * page 2, line 26 - page 3, line 15; figure 1 * * page 11, line 1 - page 12, line 20 *; | [X] - ANONYMOUS, "Vertical Partitioning in Cache Hierarchies", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, NEW YORK, US, (198801), vol. 30, no. 8, page 33, XP002005375 [X] 1-3,7,10-12,16 * the whole document * | [A] - KNEBEL P ET AL, "HP'S PA7100LC: A LOW-COST SUPERSCALAR PA-RISC PROCESSOR", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SPRING COMPUTER SOCIETY INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE (COMPCON), SAN FRANCISCO, FEB. 22 - 26, 1993, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (19930222), no. CONF. 38, pages 441 - 447, XP000379078 [A] 9,17,18 * page 445, paragraph 4.1 * |