EP0660238 - Circuitry and method for caching information [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.11.1997 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.01.1998 [1998/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/26] | For all designated states INTERNATIONAL BUSINESS MACHINES CORPORATION Armonk, NY 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Auslander, Marc Alan 12 Hidden Hollow Lane Millwood, New York 10546 / US | 02 /
Chang, Albert 980 Hanover Road Yorktown Heights, New York 10598 / US | 03 /
Meade, Robert Morris R.R. 1, Box 46 Wassaic, New York 12592 / US | [1995/26] | Representative(s) | Moss, Robert Douglas IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/26] | Moss, Robert Douglas IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | Application number, filing date | 94309519.0 | 19.12.1994 | [1995/26] | Priority number, date | US19930173448 | 22.12.1993 Original published format: US 173448 | [1995/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0660238 | Date: | 28.06.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.04.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G06F12/08 | [1995/26] | CPC: |
G06F12/0864 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1995/26] | Title | German: | Schaltungsanordnung und Verfahren zur Cachespeicherung von Informationen | [1995/26] | English: | Circuitry and method for caching information | [1995/26] | French: | Circuit et procédé d'antémémorisation d'informations | [1995/26] | Examination procedure | 24.10.1995 | Examination requested [1995/51] | 19.12.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.07.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/02] | 07.08.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1998/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3868642 (SACHS HAROLD) [X] 1-4,7-10 * column 2, line 24 - column 3, line 40; figure 1 *; | [A] - CONTI, "Concepts for buffer storage", COMPUTER GROUP NEWS, NEW YORK US, (196903), vol. 2, no. 8, pages 9 - 13, XP000226637 [A] 1,7 * page 11, column L, line 34 - column R, line 15; figure 2 * |