EP0663685 - Wafer holder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.01.1999 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.02.1999 [1999/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SHIN-ETSU HANDOTAI COMPANY LIMITED 4-2, Marunouchi 1-Chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/29] | For all designated states SHIN-ETSU HANDOTAI COMPANY LIMITED 4-2, Marunouchi 1-Chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Uchiyama, Isao 10, Aza-Shimonishihira, Oaza-Odakura, Nishigo-mura Nishi-shirakawa-gun, Fukushima-ken / JP | 02 /
Kudo, Hideo 80-43, Aza-Sugiyama, Oaza-Yone, Nishigo-mura Nishi-shirakawa-gun, Fukushima-ken / JP | [1995/29] | Representative(s) | Whalley, Kevin Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/29] | Whalley, Kevin MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 94309602.4 | 21.12.1994 | [1995/29] | Priority number, date | JP19940003354 | 18.01.1994 Original published format: JP 335494 | [1995/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0663685 | Date: | 19.07.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0663685 | Date: | 25.02.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.04.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/00 | [1995/29] | CPC: |
H01L21/67017 (EP,US);
H01L21/67 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1995/29] | Title | German: | Plättchen-Halter | [1995/29] | English: | Wafer holder | [1995/29] | French: | Support de galette | [1995/29] | Examination procedure | 20.06.1995 | Examination requested [1995/33] | 10.10.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.04.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.08.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.12.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.01.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.04.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.07.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 11.07.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.11.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2567160 (RECIF SA [FR]) [A] * the whole document *; | [A]US5191908 (HIROE TOSHIO [US], et al) [A] * the whole document * | [X] - G.W.RINGEL, "REPEATEDLY ORIENTED WAFER CHUCK", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, NEW YORK, vol. 18, no. 12, pages 4086 - 4087 [X] 1,4 * the whole document * |