EP0665482 - Spindle apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.05.2000 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.05.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.06.2000 [2000/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Instruments Inc. 8 Nakase 1-chome, Mihama-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba 261 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/31] | For all designated states SEIKO INSTRUMENTS INC. 8 Nakase 1-chome, Mihama-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba 261 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kihara, Hiroyuki, c/o Seiko Seiki K.K. 3-1, Yashiki 4-chome Narashino-shi, Chiba / JP | [1995/31] | Representative(s) | Sturt, Clifford Mark, et al Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/31] | Sturt, Clifford Mark, et al J. MILLER & CO. 34 Bedford Row Holborn London WC1R 4JH / GB | Application number, filing date | 94309819.4 | 23.12.1994 | [1995/31] | Priority number, date | JP19930333211 | 27.12.1993 Original published format: JP 33321193 | [1995/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0665482 | Date: | 02.08.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.05.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/406, G05B19/4065 | [1995/31] | CPC: |
G05B19/406 (EP,US);
G05B19/4065 (EP,US);
Y10T409/303752 (EP,US);
Y10T409/309352 (EP,US);
Y10T409/309408 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1995/31] | Title | German: | Spindelgerät | [1995/31] | English: | Spindle apparatus | [1995/31] | French: | Broche | [1995/31] | Examination procedure | 31.01.1996 | Examination requested [1996/13] | 06.05.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.10.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.06.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.12.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/25] | 26.01.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2000/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5163334 (LI CHENG-JIH [US], et al) [Y] 1-9 * column 4, line 28 - line 66; figures 5-7 *; | [Y]JPH0426383 ; | [A]US5109700 (HICHO MICHAEL D [US]) [A] 1-9 * column 5, line 6 - column 10, line 11; figures 1-9 *; | [A]JPH01289644 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920511), vol. 016, no. 192, Database accession no. (E - 1199), & JP04026383 A 19920129 (ANRITSU CORP) [Y] 1-9 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900209), vol. 014, no. 071, Database accession no. (M - 0933), & JP01289644 A 19891121 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1-9 * abstract * |