EP0692194 - Cellulosic food casing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 15.09.2006 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2008 | Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representative | published on 22.10.2008 [2008/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Viskase Companies, Inc. 625 Willowbrook Central Parkway Willowbrook, IL 60527 / US | [2006/42] |
Former [2005/15] | For all designated states Viskase Companies, Inc. 625 Willowbrook Centre Parkway Willowbrook, IL 60527 / US | ||
Former [2002/27] | For all designated states Viskase Corporation 625 Willowbrook Centre Parkway Willowbrook, Illinois 60527 / US | ||
Former [1996/03] | For all designated states VISKASE CORPORATION 6855 West 65th Street Chicago, Illinois 60638 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nicholson, Myron Donald 13102 South Red Drive Lemont, Illinois 60439 / US | [1996/03] | Representative(s) | WP Thompson 138 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/03] | W.P. THOMPSON & CO. Eastcheap House Central Approach Letchworth, Hertfordshire SG6 3DS / GB | Application number, filing date | 94309829.3 | 23.12.1994 | [1996/03] | Priority number, date | US19940275889 | 15.07.1994 Original published format: US 275889 | [1996/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0692194 | Date: | 17.01.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0692194 | Date: | 16.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/42] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0692194 | Date: | 18.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.08.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A22C13/00 | [1996/03] | CPC: |
A22C13/0013 (EP,US);
B29C48/10 (EP,US);
B29C48/919 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/03] | Title | German: | Zellulosenahrungsmittelhülle | [1996/03] | English: | Cellulosic food casing | [1996/03] | French: | Enveloppe cellulosique pour aliments | [1996/03] | Examination procedure | 22.01.1996 | Examination requested [1996/12] | 21.12.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.07.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 22.06.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.08.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 01.11.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.05.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.08.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 14.08.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
16.07.2003
30.07.2003
ADMISSIBLE Kalle GmbH 65174 Wiesbaden / DE Opponent's representative Plate, Jürgen Plate Schweitzer Zounek Patentanwalt Industriepark Kalle-Albert, Gebäude H391 Rheingaustraße 196 65203 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/43] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
16.07.2003
30.07.2003
ADMISSIBLE Kalle GmbH 65174 Wiesbaden / DE Opponent's representative Plate, Jürgen Plate Schweitzer Zounek Patentanwälte Rheingaustrasse 196 65203 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [2005/29] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
16.07.2003
30.07.2003
ADMISSIBLE Kalle GmbH 65174 Wiesbaden / DE Opponent's representative Plate, Jürgen, Dr. Patentanwaltskanzlei Zounek, Industriepark Kalle Albert, Gebäude H391 Rheingaustrasse 196 65203 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [2003/37] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
16.07.2003
30.07.2003
ADMISSIBLE Kalle GmbH & Co. KG Rheingaustrasse 190-196 65203 Wiesbaden / DE Opponent's representative Plate, Jürgen, Dr. Patentanwaltskanzlei Zounek, Industriepark Kalle-Albert, Rheingaustrass196 65203 Wiesbaden / DE | 21.08.2003 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 01.03.2004 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 14.12.2005 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 14.12.2005 | Date of oral proceedings | 10.02.2006 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 10.02.2006 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 02.06.2006 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 29.08.2006 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Request for further processing for: | 19.07.1999 | Request for further processing filed | 19.07.1999 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.08.1999 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.10.2002 | CH | 16.10.2002 | GR | 16.10.2002 | IT | 16.10.2002 | LI | 16.10.2002 | NL | 16.10.2002 | IE | 23.12.2002 | LU | 23.12.2002 | DK | 16.01.2003 | PT | 16.01.2003 | SE | 16.01.2003 | MC | 01.07.2003 | [2008/05] |
Former [2007/16] | AT | 16.10.2002 | |
CH | 16.10.2002 | ||
GR | 16.10.2002 | ||
LI | 16.10.2002 | ||
NL | 16.10.2002 | ||
IE | 23.12.2002 | ||
LU | 23.12.2002 | ||
DK | 16.01.2003 | ||
PT | 16.01.2003 | ||
SE | 16.01.2003 | ||
MC | 01.07.2003 | ||
Former [2006/44] | AT | 16.10.2002 | |
CH | 16.10.2002 | ||
GR | 16.10.2002 | ||
LI | 16.10.2002 | ||
NL | 16.10.2002 | ||
IE | 23.12.2002 | ||
LU | 23.12.2002 | ||
PT | 16.01.2003 | ||
SE | 16.01.2003 | ||
MC | 01.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | AT | 16.10.2002 | |
CH | 16.10.2002 | ||
GR | 16.10.2002 | ||
LI | 16.10.2002 | ||
NL | 16.10.2002 | ||
IE | 23.12.2002 | ||
LU | 23.12.2002 | ||
PT | 16.01.2003 | ||
SE | 16.01.2003 | ||
Former [2004/01] | AT | 16.10.2002 | |
CH | 16.10.2002 | ||
GR | 16.10.2002 | ||
LI | 16.10.2002 | ||
NL | 16.10.2002 | ||
IE | 23.12.2002 | ||
PT | 16.01.2003 | ||
SE | 16.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/39] | AT | 16.10.2002 | |
CH | 16.10.2002 | ||
GR | 16.10.2002 | ||
LI | 16.10.2002 | ||
NL | 16.10.2002 | ||
PT | 16.01.2003 | ||
SE | 16.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/37] | AT | 16.10.2002 | |
GR | 16.10.2002 | ||
NL | 16.10.2002 | ||
PT | 16.01.2003 | ||
SE | 16.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/31] | GR | 16.10.2002 | |
NL | 16.10.2002 | ||
PT | 16.01.2003 | ||
SE | 16.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/30] | NL | 16.10.2002 | |
PT | 16.01.2003 | ||
SE | 16.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/29] | PT | 16.01.2003 | |
SE | 16.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/27] | SE | 16.01.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2521101 (THOR CLIFFORD J B, et al) [A] 1 * claims 1-12 *; | [DY]EP0118784 (UNION CARBIDE CORP [US]) [DY] 1-10 * page 20 - page 21; claims 1-24 *; | [Y]DD218121 (CHEMIEFASER KOMB SCHWARZA WILH [DD]) [Y] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [DA]EP0140184 (UNION CARBIDE CORP [US]) [DA] 1* claims 1-20 *; | [A]EP0468284 (VISKASE CORP [US]) [A] 1 * claims 1-31 *; | [A]EP0502431 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [A] 1 * claims 1-9 *; | [DY]WO9313670 (VISKASE CORP [US], et al) [DY] 1-10 * claims 1-38 * | Opposition | WO9219807 |