EP0610130 - Method of manufacturing à semiconductor component, in particular a buried ridge laser [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1994/32] | Method of manufacturing à semi-conducteur component, in particular a buried ridge laser, and component made by this method | ||
[1998/26] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.04.1999 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.04.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.06.1999 [1999/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALCATEL 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [1999/08] |
Former [1998/20] | For all designated states ALCATEL ALSTHOM COMPAGNIE GENERALE D'ELECTRICITE 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1994/32] | For all designated states ALCATEL N.V. Strawinskylaan 341, (World Trade Center) NL-1077 XX Amsterdam / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Goldstein, Léon 1, Allée du Colombier F-92370 Chaville / FR | 02 /
Bonnevie, Dominique 15, Rue Georges Clémenceau F-91310 Leuville sur Orge / FR | [1998/25] |
Former [1994/32] | 01 /
Goldstein, Leon 1, Allee du Colombier F-92370 Chaville / FR | ||
02 /
Bonnevie, Dominique 15, Rue Georges Clémenceau F-91310 Leuville sur Orge / FR | Representative(s) | Fournier, Michel Robert Marie, et al Alcatel Lucent Intellectual Property & Standards 54 rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1999/19] | Fournier, Michel Robert Marie, et al COMPAGNIE FINANCIERE ALCATEL Département Propriété Industrielle 30, avenue Kléber 75116 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1994/32] | Bourely, Paul, et al SOSPI 14-16, rue de la Baume F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 94400210.4 | 01.02.1994 | [1994/32] | Priority number, date | FR19930001212 | 04.02.1993 Original published format: FR 9301212 | [1994/32] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0610130 | Date: | 10.08.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0610130 | Date: | 24.06.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.04.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H01L33/00, H01L21/20, H01S3/19 | [1994/32] | CPC: |
H01L33/0062 (EP,US);
H01S5/305 (EP,US);
Y10S148/095 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1994/32] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Halbleiterbauteils, insbesondere eines Lasers mit vergrabener Streifenwellenleiterstruktur | [1998/26] | English: | Method of manufacturing à semiconductor component, in particular a buried ridge laser | [1998/26] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'un composant semiconducteur notamment d'un laser à arête enterrée | [1998/26] |
Former [1994/32] | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Halbleiterkomponente, insbesondere eines Lasers mit vergrabener Streifenstruktur und nach diesem Verfahren hergestellte Komponente | ||
Former [1994/32] | Method of manufacturing à semi-conducteur component, in particular a buried ridge laser, and component made by this method | ||
Former [1994/32] | Procédé de fabrication d'un composant semi-conducteur notamment d'un laser à arête enterrée, et composant fabriqué par ce procédé | Examination procedure | 09.12.1994 | Examination requested [1995/05] | 10.01.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.07.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.04.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.12.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.03.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 02.03.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.03.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS6232679 ; | [A]JPS6482585 ; | [A] - H. JUNG AND E. SCHLOSSER, "InP/InGaAsP buried mesa ridge laser: A new ridge laser with reduced leakage currents", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS., NEW YORK US, (19890529), vol. 54, no. 22, doi:doi:10.1063/1.101155, pages 2171 - 2173, XP000050402 [A] 1,2,7,8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.101155 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870709), vol. 11, no. 212, Database accession no. (E - 522), & JP62032679 A 19870212 (NEC CORP) [A] 1,2,7,8 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890713), vol. 13, no. 307, Database accession no. (E - 787), & JP01082585 A 19890328 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1,2,7,8 * abstract * |