EP0611197 - Sealing strip, particularly for building woodwork and product incorporating such a sealing strip [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.09.1998 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.10.1998 [1998/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HUTCHINSON 2, rue Balzac 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/33] | For all designated states HUTCHINSON 2 rue Balzac F-75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Douillet, Jacques 83, rue Roger Dumarais F-38430 Moirans / FR | [1994/33] | Representative(s) | Orès, Bernard, et al Cabinet ORES 36, rue de St Pétersbourg 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/33] | Orès, Bernard, et al Cabinet ORES 6, Avenue de Messine F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 94400251.8 | 04.02.1994 | [1994/33] | Priority number, date | FR19930001302 | 05.02.1993 Original published format: FR 9301302 | [1994/33] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0611197 | Date: | 17.08.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.06.1994 | Classification | IPC: | E06B7/23, E06B3/62 | [1994/33] | CPC: |
E06B7/2314 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE [1994/33] | Title | German: | Dichtungsstreifen, insbesondere für die Rahmen eines Gebäudes und Produkt mit einem solchen Dichtungsstreifen | [1994/33] | English: | Sealing strip, particularly for building woodwork and product incorporating such a sealing strip | [1994/33] | French: | Garniture d'étanchéité, notamment pour menuiserie de bâtiment et produit incorporant une telle garniture | [1994/33] | Examination procedure | 01.09.1994 | Examination requested [1994/44] | 04.10.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.03.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.05.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/44] | 04.06.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1998/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1998 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US4898760 (HALBERSTADT ET AL) [X] 1-4,6,7 * column W * [Y] 5,9-11; | [X]EP0247533 (SAAR-GUMMIWERK) [X] 1-4,6 * the whole document *; | [Y]US1799904 (HOWLETT ET AL) [Y] 5 * column W *; | [YA]GB2251260 (SCHOLES) [Y] 9-11 * the whole document * [A] 8; | [A]DE2502223 (SCHLEGEL) [A] 8-11 * the whole document * |