EP0612518 - Cosmetic composition containing a phosphate surfactant and a co-surfactant [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.07.1998 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Colgate-Palmolive Company 300 Park Avenue New York, NY 10022 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Colgate-Palmolive Company 300 Park Avenue New York NY 10022-7499 / US | ||
Former [1994/35] | For all designated states Colgate-Palmolive Company 300 Park Avenue New York, N.Y. 10022-7499 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Haugk, Peter D. 171 Gettysburg Way Lincoln Park, New Jersey 07035 / US | [1994/35] | Representative(s) | Le Guen, Gérard, et al CABINET LAVOIX 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cédex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/35] | Le Guen, Gérard, et al CABINET LAVOIX 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves F-75441 Paris Cédex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 94400363.1 | 18.02.1994 | [1994/35] | Priority number, date | US19930023829 | 23.02.1993 Original published format: US 23829 | [1994/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0612518 | Date: | 31.08.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0612518 | Date: | 17.09.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.06.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/50 | [1994/35] | CPC: |
A61Q5/02 (EP,US);
A61K8/44 (EP,US);
A61K8/556 (EP,US);
A61Q19/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1994/35] | Title | German: | Kosmetische Zusammensetzung enthaltend ein Phosphattensid und ein Cotensid | [1994/35] | English: | Cosmetic composition containing a phosphate surfactant and a co-surfactant | [1994/35] | French: | Composition cosmétique contenant un tensio-actif phosphate et un co-tensio-actif | [1994/35] | Examination procedure | 30.01.1995 | Examination requested [1995/13] | 06.11.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.03.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.06.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 11.06.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.06.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.09.1997 | CH | 17.09.1997 | DK | 17.09.1997 | ES | 17.09.1997 | LI | 17.09.1997 | NL | 17.09.1997 | SE | 17.12.1997 | IE | 18.02.1998 | LU | 18.02.1998 | [2004/39] |
Former [2003/08] | AT | 17.09.1997 | |
CH | 17.09.1997 | ||
DK | 17.09.1997 | ||
ES | 17.09.1997 | ||
LI | 17.09.1997 | ||
NL | 17.09.1997 | ||
SE | 17.12.1997 | ||
IE | 18.02.1998 | ||
LU | 28.02.1998 | ||
Former [2002/26] | AT | 17.09.1997 | |
CH | 17.09.1997 | ||
DK | 17.09.1997 | ||
ES | 17.09.1997 | ||
LI | 17.09.1997 | ||
SE | 17.12.1997 | ||
IE | 18.02.1998 | ||
LU | 28.02.1998 | ||
Former [2001/01] | AT | 17.09.1997 | |
CH | 17.09.1997 | ||
DK | 17.09.1997 | ||
LI | 17.09.1997 | ||
SE | 17.12.1997 | ||
IE | 18.02.1998 | ||
LU | 28.02.1998 | ||
Former [2000/07] | AT | 17.09.1997 | |
CH | 17.09.1997 | ||
DK | 17.09.1997 | ||
LI | 17.09.1997 | ||
SE | 17.12.1997 | ||
LU | 28.02.1998 | ||
Former [1998/30] | AT | 17.09.1997 | |
CH | 17.09.1997 | ||
DK | 17.09.1997 | ||
LI | 17.09.1997 | ||
SE | 17.12.1997 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 17.09.1997 | |
CH | 17.09.1997 | ||
LI | 17.09.1997 | ||
SE | 17.12.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB884777 (GEN MILLS INC) [A] 1 * page 3 - page 4; example 4 *; | [A]EP0371803 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [A] 1 * page 19; example 8 ** page 22; example 21 *; | [DA]EP0442701 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [DA] 1 * & US-A-5139781;; claim 2 * |