EP0646990 - Security and/or discrimination device for electrical sockets [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.03.1998 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.04.1998 [1998/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PROFESSIONAL GENERAL ELECTRONIC PRODUCTS P.G.E.P. 130 rue Jean-Pierre Timbaud 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/31] | For all designated states PROFESSIONAL GENERAL ELECTRONIC PRODUCTS P.G.E.P. 130 rue Jean-Pierre Timbaud F-92400 Courbevoie / FR | ||
Former [1995/14] | For all designated states P.G.E.P. PROFESSIONAL GENERAL ELECTRONIC PRODUCTS Société Anonyme 130 rue Jean-Pierre Timbaud F-92400 Courbevoie / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Blanchot, Michèle 11, rue de Lommoye F-78270 Cravent / FR | 02 /
Palisson, Yves 1026, rue de Monerjou F-45130 Huisseau sur Mauves / FR | [1995/14] | Representative(s) | Loyer, Bertrand Cabinet Loyer & Abello 9, rue de la Forge 75017 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/14] | Loyer, Bertrand Cabinet Pierre Loyer 77, rue Boissière F-75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 94400437.3 | 02.03.1994 | [1995/14] | Priority number, date | FR19930011556 | 29.09.1993 Original published format: FR 9311556 | [1995/14] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0646990 | Date: | 05.04.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0646990 | Date: | 02.05.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.06.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/453 | [1995/14] | CPC: |
H01R13/4534 (EP,US);
H01R2103/00 (EP,US);
H01R24/66 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1995/14] | Title | German: | Sicherheitsvorrichtung und/oder Vorrichtung zum Unterscheiden verschiedener Steckdosen | [1995/14] | English: | Security and/or discrimination device for electrical sockets | [1995/14] | French: | Perfectionnements aux dispositifs de sécurité et/ou de discrimination pour prises de courant | [1995/14] | Examination procedure | 26.05.1995 | Examination requested [1995/32] | 26.10.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.02.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 15.10.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 22.10.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.01.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 18.01.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.02.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB612486 (CRABTREE & CO LTD J A, et al) [X] 1-5,7,9 * page 2, line 84 - line 121; figures 1,2 *; | [X]GB682727 (CRABTREE & CO LTD J A, et al) [X] 1,2,4,7,9 * page 1, line 78 - page 2, line 76; figures 4,5 *; | [X]GB763001 (PARSONS C H LTD, et al) [X] 1,7,9 * page 2, line 3 - line 47; figures 2-4 *; | [YA]FR2584873 (ARNOULD APP ELECTR [FR]) [Y] 6 * page 5, line 32 - page 6, line 28; figure - * [A] 1-4,7; | [A]DE9211368U (DEUTSCHE ELECTRAPLAN GMBH) [A] 1-4,6,7* page 5, line 13 - page 6, line 18; figure - *; | [XY]EP0539093 (MK ELECTRIC LTD [GB]) [X] 1-5,7,9,10 * column 2, line 13 - column 3, line 11; figures 1-3 * [Y] 6; | [X]GB2260863 (MK ELECTRIC LTD [GB]) [X] 1-4,7,9 * page 3, line 31 - line 35 * * page 4, line 10 - page 5, line 10; figures 5,6 * |