EP0616441 - System for reestablishing the quality of transmission of a link including amplifiers in case of failure of one or several of these amplifiers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.04.2000 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.04.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.06.2000 [2000/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALCATEL 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1999/25] | For all designated states ALCATEL 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1994/38] | For all designated states ALCATEL CIT 12 Rue de la Baume F-75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pamart, Jean-Luc Ker Hoadenn Quemperven F-22450 La Roche Derrien / FR | 02 /
Ollivier, Francois-Xavier Chemin du Beg Hent - Servel F-22300 Lannion / FR | 03 /
Morin, Stéphane 14, rue des Frères Lagadec F-22300 Lannion / FR | 04 /
Uhel, Roland Kermazuel F-29121 Clohars Carnoet / FR | [1994/38] | Representative(s) | Sciaux, Edmond, et al Alcatel-Lucent International 148/152 route de la Reine 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/38] | Sciaux, Edmond, et al c/o SOSPI, 14-16 rue de la Baume F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 94400565.1 | 15.03.1994 | [1994/38] | Priority number, date | FR19930003015 | 16.03.1993 Original published format: FR 9303015 | [1994/38] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0616441 | Date: | 21.09.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0616441 | Date: | 30.06.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H04B10/16 | [1994/38] | CPC: |
H04B10/2933 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT [1994/38] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Wiederherstellung der Übertragungsgüte einer Verbindung mit Verstärkern beim Ausfall eines der mehrerer Verstärker | [1994/38] | English: | System for reestablishing the quality of transmission of a link including amplifiers in case of failure of one or several of these amplifiers | [1994/38] | French: | Système pour rétablir la qualité de transmission d'une liaison incluant des équipements amplificateurs, en cas de défaillance d'un ou de plusieurs de ces équipements amplificateurs | [1994/38] | Examination procedure | 02.02.1995 | Examination requested [1995/13] | 02.06.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.10.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.01.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 07.01.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.03.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4727601 (KONISHI KUNIYOSHI [JP]) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 3, line 16 - line 23 *; | [A]JPS59190735 ; | [A]JPH02155323 ; | [A]GB2206461 (GOULD INC) [A] 1 * page 3, paragraph 1; figure 3 * | [A] - T.IWAKAMI ET AL, "Optical Data Highway Using Error - Free Bypassing Technique", NEC RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT., TOKYO JP, (198207), no. 66, pages 16 - 24, XP000808579 [A] 1,2 * page 20, column R, paragraph L - page 22, column L, paragraph 2; figures 2B,7 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850302), vol. 9, no. 49, Database accession no. (E - 300), & JP59190735 A 00000000 (NIPPON DENKI) [A] 1,2 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900905), vol. 14, no. 411, Database accession no. (E - 0973), & JP02155323 A 00000000 (NEC) [A] 1 * abstract * |