EP0617371 - Interactive gambling game terminal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 26.01.1996 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.1996 | Withdrawal of application | published on 13.03.1996 [1996/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LA FRANCAISE DES JEUX 5/7 rue Beffroy F-92523 Neuilly-sur-Seine / FR | [1994/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gatto, Jean-Marie 7 rue de Franqueville F-75116 Paris / FR | 02 /
Bertrand, Dominique 6 rue Lacaille F-75017 Paris / FR | [1994/39] | Representative(s) | Obolensky, Michel, et al c/o CABINET LAVOIX 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cédex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/39] | Obolensky, Michel, et al c/o CABINET LAVOIX 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves F-75441 Paris Cédex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 94400577.6 | 16.03.1994 | [1994/39] | Priority number, date | FR19930003270 | 22.03.1993 Original published format: FR 9303270 | [1994/39] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0617371 | Date: | 28.09.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G06F15/28, G07C15/00 | [1994/39] | CPC: |
G06Q50/34 (EP);
G06F15/02 (KR);
G07C15/006 (EP);
G07F17/3288 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1994/39] | Extension states | SI | 19.03.1994 | Title | German: | Interaktives Wettspielterminal | [1994/39] | English: | Interactive gambling game terminal | [1994/39] | French: | Terminal de jeux de pari interactif | [1994/39] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 20.03.1995 | Examination requested [1995/20] | 18.01.1996 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1996/11] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH04296183 ; | [A]US4108361 (KRAUSE STEPHEN R); | [A]GB2147773 (IGT RENO NEV); | [A]FR2619465 (DEFCON SA [ES]); | [X]WO9216914 (SUTCLIFFE PETER HAROLD [GB], et al) |