EP0622813 - Resistive element for power resistor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.05.1998 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.05.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.07.1998 [1998/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GEC ALSTHOM TRANSPORT SA 38, Avenue Kleber 75016 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/44] | For all designated states GEC ALSTHOM TRANSPORT SA 38, Avenue Kleber F-75016 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Couderc, Olivier 23bis, Rue Eugène Tenot F-65000 Tarbes / FR | 02 /
Puel, Bernard Rue de la Graouette F-65310 Laloubère / FR | 03 /
Teixido, Joseph 18, Allée du Bois de Lons F-64140 Lons / FR | [1994/44] | Representative(s) | Fournier, Michel, et al c/o ALCATEL ALSTHOM, Département de Propriété Industrielle, 30, avenue Kléber 75116 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/44] | Fournier, Michel, et al SOSPI 14-16, rue de la Baume F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 94400913.3 | 27.04.1994 | [1994/44] | Priority number, date | FR19930005166 | 30.04.1993 Original published format: FR 9305166 | [1994/44] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0622813 | Date: | 02.11.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0622813 | Date: | 09.07.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.08.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H01C3/12 | [1994/44] | CPC: |
H01C3/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1994/44] | Title | German: | Widerstandselement für Leistungswiderstand | [1994/44] | English: | Resistive element for power resistor | [1994/44] | French: | Elément résistif pour résistance de puissance | [1994/44] | Examination procedure | 03.03.1995 | Examination requested [1995/18] | 05.09.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.09.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.09.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.01.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.02.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 27.02.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.04.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB196480 (ROBERT FREDERICK BAERLOCHER) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [A]DE420027 (HANS OBERLAENDER) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A]DE486243 (AEG) [A] 1-5* page 1, line 30 - line 37; figure 2 * |