EP0626182 - Device for analysis of the cardiac activity for determining whether or not a tachyarrythmia may be interrupted by stimulation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1994/48] | Method of analysis of the cardiac activity for determining whether or not a tachyarrythmia may be interrupted by stimulation | ||
[1998/36] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.06.2000 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.06.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.07.2000 [2000/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELA MEDICAL (Société anonyme) 98-100, Rue Maurice Arnoux F-92541 Montrouge Cédex / FR | [1994/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jacobson, Peter 4, Route de Marienthal F-67500 Haguenau / FR | 02 /
Kroiss, Daniel 22, Rue Georges Clémenceau F-67590 Schweighouse-Moder / FR | 03 /
Henry, Christine 35, Rue de l'Aude F-75014 Paris / FR | [1999/31] |
Former [1994/48] | 01 /
Jacobsen, Peter 4, Route de Marienthal F-67500 Haguenau / FR | ||
02 /
Kroiss, Daniel 22, Rue Georges Clémenceau F-67590 Schweighouse-Moder / FR | |||
03 /
Henry, Christine 33, Rue de l'Aude F-75014 Paris / FR | Representative(s) | Laget, Jean-Loup Ipsilon Le Centralis 63, avenue du Général Leclerc 92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/48] | Laget, Jean-Loup Cabinet Pierre Loyer 77, rue Boissière F-75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 94401055.2 | 11.05.1994 | [1994/48] | Priority number, date | FR19930006406 | 28.05.1993 Original published format: FR 9306406 | [1994/48] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0626182 | Date: | 30.11.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0626182 | Date: | 04.08.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.09.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/368, A61N1/39 | [1994/48] | CPC: |
A61N1/3622 (EP,US);
A61N1/3925 (EP,US);
A61N1/39 (EP,US);
A61N1/3956 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, GB, IT, LI, SE [1994/48] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Herztätigkeit-Analyse zur Bestimmung, ob eine Tachyarrythmie durch Stimulation unterbrochen werden kann | [1998/36] | English: | Device for analysis of the cardiac activity for determining whether or not a tachyarrythmia may be interrupted by stimulation | [1998/36] | French: | Dispositif d'analyse de l'activité cardiaque pour déterminer si une tachyarythmie est susceptible d'être interrompue par stimulation | [1998/36] |
Former [1994/48] | Verfahren zur Herztätigkeit-Analyse zur Bestimmung, ob eine Tachyarrythmie durch Stimulation unterbrochen werden kann | ||
Former [1994/48] | Method of analysis of the cardiac activity for determining whether or not a tachyarrythmia may be interrupted by stimulation | ||
Former [1994/48] | Procédé d'analyse de l'activité cardiaque pour déterminer si une tachyarythmie est susceptible d'être interrompue par stimulation | Examination procedure | 18.01.1995 | Examination requested [1995/12] | 18.07.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.11.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.08.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.12.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.02.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 22.02.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.05.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4860749 (LEHMANN MICHAEL H [US]) [AD] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US5107850 (OLIVE ARTHUR L [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9302746 (MEDTRONIC INC [US]) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [A]EP0540141 (TELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [A] 1 * the whole document * |