EP0626166 - New process for permanent waving of hair and the composition therefor containing in association an amino or amidothiol and at least a mineral bromide [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1994/48] | New process for permanent waving of hair and the composition therefore containing in association an amino or amidotial and at least a mineral bromide | ||
[1996/44] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.01.1998 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'Oréal 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/48] | For all designated states L'OREAL 14, rue Royale F-75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Leroy, Frédéric 4bis, rue de Montesquiou F-92210 Saint Cloud / FR | 02 /
Malle, Gérard 18, Grande Rue F-77580 Villiers sur Morin / FR | 03 /
Burande, Agnès 8, avenue de la Forêt F-77270 Vileparisis / FR | 04 /
Duvault, Yolanda 21, rue d'Alésia F-93600 Aulnay-sous-Bois / FR | [1994/48] | Representative(s) | Stalla-Bourdillon, Bernard NONY & ASSOCIES, 3, rue de Penthièvre 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/48] | Stalla-Bourdillon, Bernard NONY & ASSOCIES, 29, rue Cambacérès F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 94401148.5 | 25.05.1994 | [1994/48] | Priority number, date | FR19930006218 | 25.05.1993 Original published format: FR 9306218 | [1994/48] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0626166 | Date: | 30.11.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0626166 | Date: | 19.03.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.08.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/09 | [1994/48] | CPC: |
A61Q5/04 (EP,US);
A61K8/20 (EP,US);
A61K8/46 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1994/48] | Title | German: | Neues Verfahren zur dauerhaften Haarverformung und Mittel zur Durchführung dieses Verfahrens, die eine Kombination aus einem Amino oder Amidothiol und mindestens einem mineralischen Bromid enthalten | [1997/12] | English: | New process for permanent waving of hair and the composition therefor containing in association an amino or amidothiol and at least a mineral bromide | [1997/12] | French: | Nouveau procédé de déformation permanente des cheveux et composition pour sa mise en oeuvre contenant en association un amino ou amidothiol et au moins un bromure minéral | [1994/48] |
Former [1994/48] | Neues Verfahren zur dauerhaften Haarverformung und Mittel zur Durchführung dieses Verfahrens, die eine Kombination aus einem Amino oder Amidothiol und mindestens einem mineralischem Bromid enthalten | ||
Former [1994/48] | New process for permanent waving of hair and the composition therefore containing in association an amino or amidotial and at least a mineral bromide | Examination procedure | 27.12.1994 | Examination requested [1995/08] | 07.08.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.08.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.11.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 02.11.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.12.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 19.03.1997 | [2008/05] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 19.03.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3022049 (GUREISU KAGAKU K K [JP]) [A] 1-17 * page 14, paragraph 2; example - *; | [A]WO9102538 (MORRIS JOHN CO INC [US]) [A] 1-17 * page 16, paragraph 2; claims 1,5,7 *; | [A]EP0076444 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [A] 1-17 * page 6, paragraph 2; examples 2,3.3; claim - *; | [A]EP0443356 (SCHWARZKOPF GMBH HANS [DE]) [A] 1-17 * page 4, paragraph 2; example 7; claim - *; | [A]DE1959149 (GILLETTE CO) [A] 1-17 * page 7, paragraph 2; claim - * |